Global Patent Index - EP 1043448 A1

EP 1043448 A1 2000-10-11 - Dual way vehicle for unloading rails

Title (en)

Dual way vehicle for unloading rails

Title (de)

Zweiwegefahrzeug zum Abladen von Schienen

Title (fr)

Véhicule mixte pour le déchargement de rails

Publication

EP 1043448 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00105849 A

Priority

DE 29906181 U

Abstract (en)

The vehicle (1) has a frame (4) suitable for road and railway vehicle chassis (2,3), to unload rails (10) from a wagon (8). devices (13) with guide rollers are positioned beside each other at each vehicle end (12). The devices are for guidance of the r in the longitudinal direction, and the rollers engage on the rail to be drawn off the wagon. The vehicle frame has two couplings (7,5), for connection to a rail-bound wagon or a road vehicle (6). It also has a motor for drives (40) for a cable winch, etc..

Abstract (de)

Ein Zweiwegefahrzeug (1) zum Abladen von auf Transportwaggons (8) gelagerten Schienen (10) ist mit einem wahlweise sowohl auf Straßenfahrwerken (2) als auch auf Schienenfahrwerken (3) abstützbaren Fahrzeugrahmen (4) ausgestattet. Bezüglich der Fahrzeuglängsrichtung sind an jedem Fahrzeugende (12) zwei in Fahrzeugquerrichtung nebeneinander angeordnete - Führungsrollen zur Anlage an die vom Transportwaggon (8) abzuziehende Schiene (10) aufweisende - Vorrichtungen (13) zur Schienenführung in Fahrzeuglängsrichtung angeordnet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01B 29/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60F 1/04 (2006.01); E01B 29/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01B 29/16 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29906181 U1 19990617; AT 275672 T 20040915; CN 1113011 C 20030702; CN 1269301 A 20001011; CZ 13042 U1 20030416; DK 1043448 T3 20050228; EP 1043448 A1 20001011; EP 1043448 B1 20040908; PL 198328 B1 20080630; PL 339464 A1 20001009

INPADOC legal status


2015-02-27 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140320

2015-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141001

2015-01-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140320

2015-01-15 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50007651

- Effective date: 20141001

2014-11-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140320

2014-11-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 275672 T

- Effective date: 20140320

2014-10-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50007651

2013-06-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20130222

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110321

2013-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130322

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130318

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-06-29 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110331

2012-02-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110320

2012-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111001

2012-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110331

2012-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110331

2012-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110331

2011-12-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110331

2011-12-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20111130

2011-11-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110320

2011-11-01 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2011-10-31 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2011-10-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2011-10-19 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20111001

2011-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *ROBEL BAHNBAUMASCHINEN G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20110331

2010-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20100324

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20100323

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20100324

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-05-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20100324

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100331

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100326

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20100325

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-04-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20100325

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-08-31 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050609

2005-07-15 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-02-28 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2005-02-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050112

2004-12-28 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-10-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50007651 P 20041014

2004-09-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-09-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

2004-09-08 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-09-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030725

2001-06-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE DK FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

2001-04-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010217

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

2000-10-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI