Global Patent Index - EP 1043451 A1

EP 1043451 A1 2000-10-11 - Sanitary fitting

Title (en)

Sanitary fitting

Title (de)

Sanitärarmatur

Title (fr)

Armature sanitaire

Publication

EP 1043451 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00105789 A

Priority

DE 19915526 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19915526C1] The plumbing fitting, especially for a washbasin, has a locking system (21,24) which fits into a holding zone (19) at the base (6) of the housing. It has a conical tensioning spring (21), with its end with the smaller dia. at the outer surface of the water inflow pipe (11) in a friction lock fit. The end with the larger dia. is at the base of the holding zone (19). The mantle surface of the cone spring (21) expands towards the outer end of the water inflow pipe. A seal (27) is between the holder body (24) and the housing base section (7) over it.

Abstract (de)

Eine Sanitärarmatur (1) hat einen in einem Gehäuse (2) ausgesparten Aufnahmeraum (3), der für eine die Regelelemente enthaltende Kartusche (4) vorgesehen ist. Ein Boden (6) schließt den Aufnahmeraum (3) nach unten ab. In einer Bohrung (25) des Bodens (6) ist ein Wasserzulaufrohr (11) lösbar befestigt. Das Wasserzulaufrohr (11) ist durch eine in einem Aufnahmeraum (19) des Bodens (6) angeordnete konusförmige Spannfeder (21) axial verriegelt. Die Spannfeder (21) liegt mit ihrem den kleineren Durchmesser aufweisenden Ende an der Außenfläche des Wasserzulaufrohrs (11) reibschlüssig an. Mit ihrem den größeren Durchmesser aufweisenden Ende stützt sich die Spannfeder (21) am Boden des Aufnahmeraums (19) ab. Die konusförmige Mantelfläche der Spannfeder (21) erweitert sich hin zum äußeren Ende des Wasserzulaufrohres (11). Auf diese Weise können glatte Wasserzulaufrohre in die im übrigen bereits fertigmontierte Sanitärarmatur durch einfaches Einschieben befestigt werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E03C 1/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E03C 1/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E03C 1/0403 (2013.01); Y10T 137/6977 (2015.04)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19915526 C1 20000803; EP 1043451 A1 20001011; PL 339403 A1 20001009; US 6442776 B1 20020903

INPADOC legal status


2013-12-25 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20130712

2004-03-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040213

2001-06-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010130

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI