Global Patent Index - EP 1043453 A3

EP 1043453 A3 2000-11-29 - Method and device to remove a liquid residue from equipment of water carrying vehicles

Title (en)

Method and device to remove a liquid residue from equipment of water carrying vehicles

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Entfernen von Restflüssigkeit aus Anlagenteilen Wasserführender Fahrzeuge

Title (fr)

Méthode et dispositif pour retirer un résidu liquide d'equipement de véhicules transportant de l'eau

Publication

EP 1043453 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00250113 A

Priority

DE 19916420 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19916420C1] Residual fluid is removed from lines and plant by a forcible flow of air and the lines at the same time dried inside. The air is generated by a multi-cell compressor (9) or by means of underpressurizing the compressor in the vessel sludge tank (10). The air is preheated by heat exchanger or auxiliary heater and the fluid is run off to atmosphere or to the sludge tank using a multi-way valve (11) in the air line to stop off the tank. An additional line (12) feeds preheated air to the connected valve (11). An additional multi-way valve close to the four-way valve (4) is built into an additional preheated air line.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E03F 7/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E03F 7/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E03F 7/10 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19916420 C1 20000831; EP 1043453 A2 20001011; EP 1043453 A3 20001129

INPADOC legal status


2002-10-09 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Date of withdrawal: 20020817

2002-07-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020618

2001-08-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001207

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI