Global Patent Index - EP 1043460 A2

EP 1043460 A2 2000-10-11 - Flat key

Title (en)

Flat key

Title (de)

Flachschlüssel

Title (fr)

Clé plate

Publication

EP 1043460 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00250114 A

Priority

DE 29906492 U

Abstract (en)

The key consists of a shaft (1) and a handle with two parts (2,3) divided parallel to the plane of the shaft. At least one h of the handle has an aperture for accommodating the rear end of the shaft. The second handle part is a cover which can be remova connected to the other part. At least one of the parts is designed to accommodate additional elements on its outer surface.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft einen Flachschlüssel, bestehend aus einem Schlüsselschaft (1) und einer Reide (2), die mit dem Schlüsselschaft verbunden ist. Die Reide besteht aus zwei parallel zur Schlüsselschaftebene geteilten Reidenteilen (2,3), wobei zumindest der eine Reidenteil (2) eine Ausnehmung zur Aufnahme des hinteren Endes des Schlüsselschaftes (1) aufweist. Das zweite Reidenteil (3) ist als Deckel ausgebildet, der mit dem anderen Reidenteil (2) lösbar verbindbar ist. Zumindest eines der Reidenteile ist an seiner Außenfläche zur Aufnahme von Zusatzelementen ausgebildet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 19/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 19/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 19/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29906492 U1 19990729; EP 1043460 A2 20001011; EP 1043460 A3 20040630; TR 200000937 A2 20001121

INPADOC legal status


2005-10-26 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20050104

2005-04-28 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2005-03-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2004-06-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-06-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

AL LT LV MK RO SI

2004-06-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7E 05B 19/24 A

2003-01-15 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7E 05B 19/24 A, 7B 60T 8/00 B, 7E 05B 19/04 B, 7E 05B 17/00 B

2001-03-14 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: SCHILLING, BERNHARD

2001-03-14 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: GUENTHER DIETER,

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI