Global Patent Index - EP 1043461 A1

EP 1043461 A1 2000-10-11 - Device for monitoring a closure of a locking device, in particular for doors or windows

Title (en)

Device for monitoring a closure of a locking device, in particular for doors or windows

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Verschlussüberwachung einer Verriegelungseinrichtung, insbesondere für Türen oder Fenster

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour surveillance une fermeture d'un dispositif de verrouillage, notamment pour portes ou fenêtres

Publication

EP 1043461 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00101523 A

Priority

  • DE 19916118 A
  • DE 29906380 U

Abstract (en)

An adapter rail (7) on door or window casement is coupled to a fixer bolt (2) and slides with this and a sensor (13) whose c transducer (15) and receiver (18) are fitted to rail and fixer frame. An evaluator (29)checks that both transducer and receiver in their mutual bolting bolting position so the bolt (2) engages or whether again the transducer (15) and receiver (18) are in a release position to allow the bolt to disengage. The transducer (15) should be on the rail (7) and receiver on fixed frame and t evaluator is connected to both transducer and receiver as linked by mechanical or non-contact signal transmission. The rail (7) fixed to the casement via block (8) and has a hole (12) for positive bolt securement.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Vorrichtung zur Verschlußüberwachung einer Verriegelungseinrichtung, insbesondere für Türen oder Fenster, wobei die Verriegelungseinrichtung einen verschiebbaren Verschlußbolzen (2) am Tür- oder Fensterflügel (1) zum Riegeleingriff mit einem feststehenden Rahmenteil und zum Entriegeln aufweist. Des weiteren enthält die Vorrichtung eine Adapterschiene (7), die an dem Tür- oder Fensterflügel (1) in Koppelung mit dem Verschlußbolzen (2) angeordnet und mit diesem verschiebbar ist, eine Sensoreinrichtung (13) mit einem Codegeber (15) und einem Codeempfänger (18) an der Adapterschiene (7) und an dem feststehenden Rahmenteil, und eine Auswerteeinheit (20) zum Feststellen, ob der Codegeber (15) und der Codeempfänger (18) in einer gegenseitigen Riegelzuordnung sind, bei der der Verschlußbolzen der Verriegelungseinrichtung im Riegeleingriff ist, oder ob der Codegeber (15) und der Codeempfänger (18) in einer davon abweichenden Entriegelzuordnung sind, in der der Verschlußbolzen (2) außer Riegeleingriff ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 45/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 17/22 (2006.01); E05B 45/08 (2006.01); E05B 47/00 (2006.01); E05C 9/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 17/22 (2013.01); E05B 45/083 (2013.01); E05B 2047/0069 (2013.01); E05C 9/1858 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE LI LU NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1043461 A1 20001011; EP 1043461 B1 20040721; AT 271637 T 20040815

INPADOC legal status


2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160127

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-04-29 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090126

2009-11-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090801

2009-10-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090126

2009-10-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090131

2009-10-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090131

2009-10-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20090801

2009-08-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2008-06-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20071212

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-05-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20071219

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080108

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-01-31 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20071228

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-07-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050422

2004-12-01 [NLXE] NL: OTHER COMMUNICATIONS CONCERNING EP-PATENTS (PART 3 HEADING XE)

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLXE

- Free Format Text: PAT. BUL. 10/2004: CORR.: NOVAR GMBH.

2004-10-01 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: NOVAR GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLT2

2004-09-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: ROTTMANN, ZIMMERMANN + PARTNER AG

2004-08-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50007099

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-08-26

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-07-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2004-07-28 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: NOVAR GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2004-07-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE LI LU NL

2001-09-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: EFF-EFF ALARM GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-06-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT CH DE LI LU NL

2001-06-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010411

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI