Global Patent Index - EP 1043462 A3

EP 1043462 A3 2001-04-04 - Device for the additional mechanical locking of doors

Title (en)

Device for the additional mechanical locking of doors

Title (de)

Einrichtung zur zusätzlichen mechanischen Verriegelung von Türen

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour le verrouillage mécanique supplementaire des portes

Publication

EP 1043462 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00250115 A

Priority

DE 29906490 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1043462A2] An electric motor (4) has a threaded shaft engaging the bolt (5) so that rotation withdraws or inserts the bolt into the doo jamb housing (1). A magnet (7) actuates a reed switch (6) to indicate locking and an electrical condenser (8) provides power in emergency.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 47/00; E05B 47/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 47/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 47/0012 (2013.01); E05B 17/0062 (2013.01); E05B 2047/0023 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29906490 U1 19990805; EP 1043462 A2 20001011; EP 1043462 A3 20010404

INPADOC legal status


2002-08-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20011005

2002-02-28 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-04-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7E 05B 47/00 A, 7E 05B 47/02 B

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI