Global Patent Index - EP 1043467 A1

EP 1043467 A1 2000-10-11 - Hinge for vehicle doors

Title (en)

Hinge for vehicle doors

Title (de)

Scharnier für Kraftfahrzeugtüre

Title (fr)

Charnière pour portes de véhicule

Publication

EP 1043467 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00106410 A

Priority

IT TO990270 A

Abstract (en)

Hinge for a vehicle door, comprising: a first hinge part (112) and a second hinge part (114) that can rotate relative to each other about a hinge axis (122), a hinge pin (116) mounted in the first hinge part (112) so that it can rotate about the hinge axis (122) and is constrained permanently by the first hinge part (112) in the direction of its own axis (122), and a screw (134) arranged parallel to the hinge axis (122) for fixing the second hinge part (114) detachably to the pin (116). The hinge includes a centring part (150) that is independent of the screw (134) and that has a first centring surface (158) and, coaxial with this, a second centring surface (160). The first centring surface (158) sits in a corresponding centring seat (162) formed in the second hinge part (114) and coaxial with the hinge axis (122), and the second centring surface (160) is intended to fit into a reference surface (146) in a gripper (142). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05D 5/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05D 5/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05D 5/121 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/531 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

[A] DE 3406984 A1 19850829 - SCHARWAECHTER GMBH CO KG [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1043467 A1 20001011; EP 1043467 B1 20020522; BR 0001592 A 20010102; DE 60000173 D1 20020627; DE 60000173 T2 20021114; ES 2174782 T3 20021116; IT 1307240 B1 20011030; IT TO990270 A1 20001009; PL 339286 A1 20001009; TR 200000931 A2 20001121

INPADOC legal status


2005-06-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20040325

2005-01-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041130

2004-11-17 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040324

2004-10-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041001

2004-03-25 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040325

2004-03-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040324

2003-05-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030225

2003-03-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030331

- Year of fee payment: 4

2003-02-14 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20030214

- Year of fee payment: 4

2003-02-05 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030205

- Year of fee payment: 4

2002-11-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2174782 T3

2002-10-31 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-06-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60000173 20020627

2002-05-22 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-05-22 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020522

2001-06-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

2001-06-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010426

2001-04-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010212

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-10-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI