Global Patent Index - EP 1043468 A2

EP 1043468 A2 2000-10-11 - Door hinge for motor vehicles

Title (en)

Door hinge for motor vehicles

Title (de)

Türscharnier für Kraftfahrzeuge

Title (fr)

Charnière pour portes de véhicules automobiles

Publication

EP 1043468 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00107611 A

Priority

DE 19915718 A

Abstract (en)

The circumferential surface of the hinge bolt (3) has maximum three projections (6) in bow or shoulder section to engage as suitably shaped recesses in the door post bracket opening (5a) recesses (12) so the door bracket connecting sector (4a) snugly engages the bracket opening (5a). Bolt (3) and opening (5a) are in prefered truncated cone shape in the connection sector (4a) a the projections (6) are flattened in their crest and have two side faces (13) bearing on suitably shaped supporting faces in the opening recesses (12). The sectors adjoining the flattened sides (13) act as contact faces bearing on allocated sectors of the bracket (2) hole (5a).

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Scharnier, vorzugsweise für Kraftfahrzeuge zur Anlenkung einer Tür oder einer Klappe an einer Säule mit einer Türkonsole, einer Säulenkonsole und einem Scharnierbolzen für eine drehgelenkige Verbindung der Türkonsole und der Säulenkonsole, wobei der Scharnierbolzen, der drehbar mit der Türkonsole oder mit der Säulenkonsole verbunden wird durch einen Verbindungsabschnitt verdrehsicher, aber zur Montage abnehmbar an einem Aufnahmeabschnitt der Säulenkonsole oder der Türkonsole befestigt ist, sich der Verbindungsabschnitt des mit der Türkonsole drehbar verbundenen Scharnierbolzens - in Einführungsrichtung zu dem Aufnahmeabschnitt der Säulenkonsole hin gesehen - verjüngt und der Aufnahmeabschnitt der Säulenkonsole eine Aufnahmeöffnung von entsprechend verjüngter Form aufweist, die Umfangsfläche des Scharnierbolzens an dem Verbindungsabschnitt Vorsprünge aufweist, an der Innenfläche der Aufnahmeöffnung die gleich Anzahl entsprechender Ausnehmungen zur Aufnahme der Vorsprünge angeordnet sind und sich die Vorsprünge und die Ausnehmungen jeweils unter einem Winkel zur Längsachse des Scharniernbolzens erstrecken. Um ein derartiges Scharnier zu schaffen, das neben einer verdrehsicheren Anordnung eines Scharnierbolzens in einer entsprechenden Aufnahme auch ein einfaches Ausrichten einer drehbar mit dem Scharnierbolzen verbundenen Tür gegenüber der Aufnahmeöffnung ermöglicht, weist die Umfangsfläche des Scharnierbolzens maximal drei Vorsprünge auf, die im Querschnitt bogenförmig oder wulstartig ausgebildet sind und mit korrespondierenden Ausnehmungen der Aufnahmeöffnung im Eingriff stehen und der Verbindungsabschnitt und die Aufnahmeöffnung spielfrei in Eingriff kommen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05D 5/12; E05D 11/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05D 5/12 (2006.01); E05D 5/14 (2006.01); E05D 7/12 (2006.01); E05D 11/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05D 5/128 (2013.01); E05D 5/16 (2013.01); E05D 7/121 (2013.01); E05D 11/1085 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/531 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 19633462 A1 19980226 - SCHARWAECHTER GMBH CO KG [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1043468 A2 20001011; EP 1043468 A3 20020410; DE 19915718 A1 20001019; DE 19915718 C2 20020711

INPADOC legal status


2006-10-11 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060328

2003-04-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030303

2003-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

2002-12-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021010

2002-04-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-04-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-11-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ISE INDUSTRIES GMBH

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI