Global Patent Index - EP 1043472 A2

EP 1043472 A2 2000-10-11 - Reinforcement for hollow plastic frame members

Title (en)

Reinforcement for hollow plastic frame members

Title (de)

Verstärkungselement für aus Kunststoff gefertigte Hohlkammern aufweisende Rahmenprofile

Title (fr)

Renforcement pour profilés creux en matière plastique

Publication

EP 1043472 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99125841 A

Priority

DE 19916135 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19916135C1] The reinforcement (2) has an open U-shaped cross-section and is made of a composite fiber material. The reinforcement is divided into arms of different thickness with a relatively fat support arm (3) and relatively thin spacer (4) and guide (5) arms. The fiber component in the support arm is between 60 and 90%. The spacer and guide arms have outer fabric layers (6) embedded in the plastic of the composite material.

Abstract (de)

Die vorliegende Erfindung betrifft ein Verstärkungselement (2) für aus Kunststoff gefertigte Hohlkammern (1) aufweisende Rahmenprofile, wie insbesondere Fensterprofile, wobei das Verstärkungselement (2) einen offenen, im wesentlichen U-förmigen Querschnitt aufweist und wobei das Verstärkungselement (2) erfindungsgemäß aus einem Faserverbundwerkstoff gefertigt ist. Es ist unterteilt in Schenkel unterschiedlicher Dicke mit einem relativ dickeren Tragschenkel (3) und relativ dünneren Distanz- und Führungsschenkeln (4,5), wobei der Faseranteil im Verbundwerkstoff so gewählt ist, daß sich das Verstärkungselement (2) im Pulltrusionsverfahren herstellen läßt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 3/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/222 (2013.01); E06B 2003/224 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE FR LI NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19916135 C1 20000706; AT 279631 T 20041015; EP 1043472 A2 20001011; EP 1043472 A3 20010704; EP 1043472 B1 20041013

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20161221

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-02-28 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20161221

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-02-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20161219

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20161222

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-12-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20151217

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-12-18 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 17

2009-07-24 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2009-02-28 [BECA] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER'S ADDRESS

- Owner name: SELO FENSTERBAU G.M.B.H.CARL-ZEISS-STRASSE 14, D-6

- Effective date: 20090219

2009-01-15 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: SELO FENSTERBAU GMBH

- Free text: RAINER SEBURGER#FRIEDENSRING 22#67227 FRANKENTHAL (DE) -TRANSFER TO- SELO FENSTERBAU GMBH#CARL-ZEISS-STRASSE 14#67227 FRANKENTHAL (DE)

2007-08-31 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: RAINER SEBURGER

- Free text: RAINER SEBURGER#FRIEDENSRING 22#67227 FRANKENTHAL (DE) -TRANSFER TO- RAINER SEBURGER#FRIEDENSRING 22#67227 FRANKENTHAL (DE)

2005-10-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050714

2005-09-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-04-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2005-02-01 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: SEBURGER, RAINER

2005-01-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE FELDMANN & PARTNER AG

2004-12-15 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: SEBURGER, RAINER

2004-12-15 [RIN2] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SEBURGER, RAINER

2004-11-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59910833 P 20041118

2004-10-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-10-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR LI NL

2004-10-13 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041013

2002-03-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE FR LI NL

2002-01-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011114

2001-07-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-07-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR LI NL

2000-10-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI