Global Patent Index - EP 1043476 A3

EP 1043476 A3 2000-11-15 - Device for pumping slurry

Title (en)

Device for pumping slurry

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Pumpen von Schlamm

Title (fr)

Appareil de pompage de liquides épais

Publication

EP 1043476 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 00302089 A

Priority

GB 9908056 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1043476A2] A device for pumping slurry, e.g. mud containing drill cuttings generated during drilling for oil or the like, comprises a generally horizontally disposed macerator having two counter-rotating shafts with alternating cutters and spacers above which is mounted a vertically orientated progressing cavity pump. The spaces in the macerator are axially thicker than the cutting discs so that the macerator will pass particles of a size acceptable to the pump. Impellors horizontally adjacent to the macerator are provided for agitating the slurry to be pumped. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E21B 21/06; B02C 18/40

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E21B 21/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E21B 21/06 (2013.01); B02C 18/0092 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1043476 A2 20001011; EP 1043476 A3 20001115; AU 2524500 A 20001012; CA 2304430 A1 20001008; GB 2348674 A 20001011; GB 9908056 D0 19990602; JP 2000303770 A 20001031; NO 20001815 A 20001009; NO 20001815 D0 20000407

INPADOC legal status


2002-01-02 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Date of withdrawal: 20011031

2001-08-01 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-07-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010514

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-11-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7E 21B 21/06 A, 7B 02C 18/40 B

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI