Global patent index - EP 1043483 A1

EP 1043483 A1 2000-10-11 - Method of regulating lubrication, preferably for a combustion engine and device for regulating according to this method

Title (en)

Method of regulating lubrication, preferably for a combustion engine and device for regulating according to this method

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Regeln der Schmierung, vorzugsweise bei Verbrennungsmotoren und Anordnung zum Regeln gemäss dem Verfahren

Title (fr)

Méthode de régulation de la lubrification en particulier pour un moteur à combustion interne et dispositif selon cette méthode

Publication

EP 1043483 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00105639 A

Priority

DE 19915737 A

Abstract (en)

The method involves determining the demanded oil pressure values from a characteristic field (40) for an oil pressure regula loop (2) depending on the operating state; forming a control error signal (1) from the demanded pressure value and the actual va for a selected measurement position and moving an oil delivery control element (13) accordingly An Independent claim is also included for an arrangement for regulating lubrication, preferably for internal combustion eng with a regulated oil pump.

Abstract (de)

Es ist bereits bei Brennkraftmaschinen bekannt, die Schmiermittelpumpen in Abhängigkeit vom Betriebszustand der Brennkraftmaschine unter Erfassung von Laststellung und Motordrehzahl zu regeln. Erfindungsgemäß wird die Schmiermittelpumpe über ein Kennfeld gesteuert, wobei die Kenngrößen dem Motorsteuergerät entnommen werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01M 1/16; F16N 29/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01M 1/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01M 1/16 (2013.01); F01M 2250/60 (2013.01); F01M 2250/62 (2013.01); F01M 2250/64 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1043483 A1 20001011; EP 1043483 B1 20050302; DE 19915737 A1 20001012

INPADOC legal status

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160330

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160324

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160322

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160322

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-03-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 17

2006-02-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20051205

2005-12-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2005-04-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50009613

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-04-07

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-03-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20050302

2005-03-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2005-03-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-02-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040109

2001-06-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IT

2000-12-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001025

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-10-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI