Global Patent Index - EP 1043497 A2

EP 1043497 A2 2000-10-11 - Control valve

Title (en)

Control valve

Title (de)

Schaltventil

Title (fr)

Soupape de commande

Publication

EP 1043497 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00107266 A

Priority

DE 19915686 A

Abstract (en)

The switching valve (10) has a valve body (20), in which there is a flow channel (24), one end of which comes out in a worki cavity (42). This cavity contains a valve plate (44) which can moved between closed and open positions. A closing element (50) i fitted between the valve plate and the mouth of the flow channel, closing it when the valve plate is in the closed position.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Schaltventil (10) mit einem Ventilkörper (20), in dem ein Strömungskanal (24) ausgebildet ist, der mit seinem einen Ende in einen Arbeitsraum (42) mündet. In dem Arbeitsraum (42) ist eine Ventilplatte (44) aufgenommen, die zwischen einer Schließstellung und einer Freigabestellung bewegbar ist. Zwischen der Ventilplatte (44) und der Mündung (26) des Strömungskanales (24) ist ein Schließelement (50) angeordnet, das diese verschließt, wenn sich die Ventilplatte (44) in ihrer Schließstellung befindet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 47/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 61/16 (2006.01); F02M 47/00 (2006.01); F02M 47/02 (2006.01); F02M 51/00 (2006.01); F02M 59/46 (2006.01); F02M 63/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 47/027 (2013.01); F02M 63/0036 (2013.01); F02M 2200/304 (2013.01); Y10S 239/90 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1043497 A2 20001011; EP 1043497 A3 20030416; EP 1043497 B1 20041201; DE 19915686 A1 20001012; JP 2000310170 A 20001107; JP 3667592 B2 20050706; US 6360972 B1 20020326

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160425

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160427

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160427

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-02-25 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20150129 AND 20150204

2015-02-18 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20150122 AND 20150128

2014-10-10 [REG FR TQ] PARTIAL TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: ISUZU MOTORS LIMITED, JP

- Effective date: 20140909

2014-10-10 [REG FR TQ] PARTIAL TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: DELPHI INTERNATIONAL OPERATIONS LUXEMBOURG S.A, LU

- Effective date: 20140909

2014-08-14 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: ISUZU MOTORS LTD., JP

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: DELPHI TECHNOLOGIES HOLDING S.A, ISUZU MOTORS LTD., , JP

- Document: DE 50008794

- Effective date: 20140703

2014-08-14 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: DELPHI INTERNATIONAL OPERATIONS LUXEMBOURG S.A, LU

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: DELPHI TECHNOLOGIES HOLDING S.A, ISUZU MOTORS LTD., , JP

- Document: DE 50008794

- Effective date: 20140703

2014-08-14 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: ISUZU MOTORS LTD., JP

- Free text: FORMER OWNERS: DELPHI TECHNOLOGIES HOLDING S.A.R.L., BASCHARAGE, LU; ISUZU MOTORS LTD., TOKIO/TOKYO, JP

- Document: DE 50008794

- Effective date: 20140703

2014-08-14 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: DELPHI INTERNATIONAL OPERATIONS LUXEMBOURG S.A, LU

- Free text: FORMER OWNERS: DELPHI TECHNOLOGIES HOLDING S.A.R.L., BASCHARAGE, LU; ISUZU MOTORS LTD., TOKIO/TOKYO, JP

- Document: DE 50008794

- Effective date: 20140703

2014-08-14 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50008794

- Representative's name: MANITZ, FINSTERWALD & PARTNER GBR, DE

- Effective date: 20140703

2011-03-11 [REG FR TQ] PARTIAL TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2005-11-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050902

2005-09-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-01-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50008794 P 20050105

2004-12-30 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-12-22 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20041201

2004-12-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-12-01 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-01-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-12-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031024

2003-09-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030702

2003-04-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-04-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI