Global Patent Index - EP 1043499 A1

EP 1043499 A1 2000-10-11 - Method and apparatus to avoid belt sliding

Title (en)

Method and apparatus to avoid belt sliding

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Vermeidung eines Riemenschlupfes

Title (fr)

Méthode et dispositif pour empêcher le glissement de courroie

Publication

EP 1043499 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00104204 A

Priority

DE 19915834 A

Abstract (en)

The method involves determining a measure of the danger of belt slip and if this value exceeds a threshold value, braking or accelerating the generator so that slip or the danger of slip is reduced. The shaft angular acceleration or deceleration can be as the measure of the danger of slipping. An Independent claim is also included for an arrangement for preventing belt slip.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren und eine Vorrichtung zur Verminderung des Riemenschlupfes bei einem Riemen, der einen Generator mit einer Welle eines Motors verbindet, wobei der Generator auch als Antriebsmotor (Starter) betreibbar ist. Um einen übermäßigen Verschleiß und das mit einem Riemenschlupf verbundene Geräusch zu vermeiden wird vorgeschlagen, ein Maß für die Gefahr eines Riemenschlupfes zu ermitteln bei Überschreiten eines Grenzwertes den Generator derart zu beaufschlagen, nämlich abzubremsen oder zu beschleunigen, daß der Schlupf oder die Gefahr für den Schlupf verringert wird.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02N 11/04; F02N 15/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02N 11/04 (2006.01); F02N 15/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02N 15/08 (2013.01); F02N 11/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1043499 A1 20001011; EP 1043499 B1 20031217; DE 19915834 C1 20001116; ES 2212760 T3 20040801

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160331

2016-12-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20161130

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160330

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160324

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160322

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20160322

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160322

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150330

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-03-30 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 16

2004-12-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040920

2004-08-20 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-08-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2212760 T3

2004-03-30 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-02-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040121

2004-01-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50004761 P 20040129

2003-12-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2003-12-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-06-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT SE

2001-01-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001110

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2000-10-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI