Global patent index - EP 1043500 A3

EP 1043500 A3 2001-03-14 - Pivot joint for a swash plate of a variable displacement compressor

Title (en)

Pivot joint for a swash plate of a variable displacement compressor

Title (de)

Schwenkgelenk für die Schrägscheibe eines variablen Verdrängungskompressors

Title (fr)

Joint pivotant pour un plateau-came d'un compresseur à capacité variable

Publication

EP 1043500 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 00107418 A

Priority

JP 9888599 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1043500A2] A variable displacement compressor the displacement of which depends on the inclination of a drive plate (50). The compressor includes a sleeve (18) fitted on a drive shaft (16). The sleeve (18) supports a pivot joint for supporting the drive plate (50). The maximum inclination of the drive plate (50) depends on the distance (Sx) between the pivot axis of the drive plate (16) and an end that abuts against a limit stop. Therefore changing the sleeve (18) changes the maximum displacement. Changing the sleeve (18) does not alter the balance of the drive plate (50). In compressors having different displacements, all parts are the same except for the sleeve (18), which facilitates mass production. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04B 27/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04B 27/14 (2006.01); F04B 27/08 (2006.01); F04B 27/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04B 27/1072 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1043500 A2 20001011; EP 1043500 A3 20010314; JP 2000291541 A 20001017

INPADOC legal status

2003-05-28 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20021101

2001-12-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOYOTA JIDOSHOKKI

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-12-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR IT

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-10-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000405

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2000-10-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI