Global Patent Index - EP 1043503 A2

EP 1043503 A2 2000-10-11 - Vane pump with capacity control

Title (en)

Vane pump with capacity control

Title (de)

Mengenregelbare Flügelzellenpumpe

Title (fr)

Pompe à palettes à déplacement variable

Publication

EP 1043503 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00105640 A

Priority

DE 19915738 A

Abstract (en)

In the pump casing (10) a bearing socket (18) is provided in which a bearing segment (73) of a ring (7) can pivot to adjust stroke of vanes (5). A spring loaded plunger (19) adjusts the position of the ring according to the position of a regulating ele (11).

Abstract (de)

Um bei mengenregelbaren Flügelzellenpumpen, die als Schmiermittelpumpe im Schmiermittelkreislauf einer Brennkraftmaschine angeordnet sind, eine form- und kraftschlüssige Lagerung für den Hubring zu schaffen, wird erfindungsgemäß vorgeschlagen, im Gehäuse eine offene Lagermulde anzuordnen, in welcher ein am Hubring radial angeformtes komplementäres Lagersegment schwenkbar gelagert ist und am Stellring eine resultierende Kraft stetig wirken zu lassen, welche durch die beim Umlauf des Rotors und beim Fördern wirkenden Kräfte und solche eines oder mehrerer Druckelemente bestimmt ist und eine solche Wirkrichtung aufweist, dass das Lagersegment in der Lagermulde des Gehäuses kraftschlüssig gehalten ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04C 2/344; F04C 15/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04C 14/22 (2006.01); F04C 2/344 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04C 14/22 (2013.01); F04C 2/3442 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1043503 A2 20001011; EP 1043503 A3 20020327; EP 1043503 B1 20031203; DE 19915738 A1 20001012

INPADOC legal status


2017-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170327

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170323

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170318

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-03-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160330

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-03-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2004-11-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040906

2004-07-28 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-07-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-01-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50004613 P 20040115

2004-01-14 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-12-24 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031203

2003-12-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-12-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-01-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021120

2002-12-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2002-06-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020413

2002-03-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-03-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI