Global Patent Index - EP 1043504 A2

EP 1043504 A2 2000-10-11 - Vane pump with capacity control

Title (en)

Vane pump with capacity control

Title (de)

Mengenregelbare Flügelzellenpumpe

Title (fr)

Pompe à palettes à déplacement variable

Publication

EP 1043504 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00105641 A

Priority

DE 19915739 A

Abstract (en)

The pump has vanes movable in radial slots in a rotor with their outer ends sliding in a lifting ring (7) enclosing the deli vol. and able to slide in a housing or pivot in a fixed bearing point in the housing, a spring displaced and held in a maximum delivery setting and a control element acting against the force of the spring acting against the maximum delivery direction. A pressure element engages the lifting ring to force it in the null delivery direction against a curved surface (12) in the housin (10) and to hold it engaged with the surface, which can be moved and/or rotated and can be displaced against a spring (F) force directed to set the maximum delivery rate.

Abstract (de)

Es sind bereits mengenregelbare Flügelzellenpumpen für den Schmierölkreis von Brennkraftmaschinen bekannt. Die Mengenregelung geschieht hierbei über einen Hubring und ist damit aufwendig. Erfindungsgemäß wird eine mechanisch kompakte und reibungsarme Stellanordnung für den Hubring dadurch geschaffen, dass am Hubring ein Druckelement angreift, das ihn in Richtung Null-Förderung gegen eine im Gehäuse gelagerte schieb- und/oder drehbare Kurve drängt und mit dieser in Eingriff hält und wobei die schieb- und/oder drehbare Kurve mittels eines von einem Druckregelkreis angesteuerten Stellgliedes gegen eine auf die Einstellung der maximalen Fördermenge gerichtete Kraft einer Feder verlagerbar ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04C 2/344; F04C 15/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04C 2/344 (2006.01); F04C 14/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04C 14/226 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1043504 A2 20001011; EP 1043504 A3 20020327; EP 1043504 B1 20030910; DE 19915739 A1 20001012

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160330

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160324

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160322

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160322

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-03-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 17

2004-09-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040614

2004-06-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-04-21 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD4D

2003-10-29 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: GERMAN

2003-10-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50003605

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-10-16

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-10-01 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

2003-09-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-09-10 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-12-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IT

2002-06-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20020413

2002-03-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-03-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI