Global patent index - EP 1043541 A2

EP 1043541 A2 2000-10-11 - Lighting assembly comprising a plurality of frameless, light pervious covers

Title (en)

Lighting assembly comprising a plurality of frameless, light pervious covers

Title (de)

Beleuchtungseinrichtung mit einer Mehrzahl von rahmenlos gehaltenen, lichtdurchlässigen Abdeckungen

Title (fr)

Dispositif d' éclairage avec plusieurs panneaux transparents supportés sans cadre

Publication

EP 1043541 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00107559 A

Priority

DE 19915615 A

Abstract (en)

An illumination arrangement comprises numerous frameless transparent covers (2) which form a surface. The arrangement consis of modules (3a,3b,3c) which comprise a housing (4) with one wall formed by the covers. The housing sections contain lights (7).

Abstract (de)

Die vorliegende Erfindung betrifft eine Beleuchtungseinrichtung mit einer Mehrzahl von rahmenlos gehaltenen, lichtdurchlässigen Abdeckungen (2), welche gemeinsam eine Fläche bilden, auf deren dem Betrachter gegenüberliegenden Seite Leuchtmittel (7) zum Beleuchten der Abdeckungen (2) angeordnet sind. Die voranstehend genannte Beleuchtungseinrichtung weist eine gute optische Erscheinung auf, kann einfach montiert, demontiert und gewartet werden und minimiert zudem die Gefahr einer Verschmutzung. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F21S 2/00; F21V 17/00; F21V 3/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21S 2/00 (2006.01); F21V 3/04 (2006.01); F21V 17/18 (2006.01); F21V 31/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21S 2/00 (2013.01); F21S 2/005 (2013.01); F21V 3/04 (2013.01); F21V 17/18 (2013.01); F21V 31/00 (2013.01); F21Y 2103/00 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1043541 A2 20001011; EP 1043541 A3 20010919; DE 19915615 A1 20001019

INPADOC legal status

2003-01-22 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20020320

2002-07-11 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2002-06-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2001-09-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-09-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-09-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7F 21S 2/00 A, 7F 21V 17/18 B, 7F 21V 3/04 B, 7F 21S 4/00 B, 7F 21V 31/00 B

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI