Global patent index - EP 1043544 A2

EP 1043544 A2 2000-10-11 - Vehicle headlamp

Title (en)

Vehicle headlamp

Title (de)

Kfz-Scheinwerfer

Title (fr)

Projecteur pour véhicule

Publication

EP 1043544 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00890076 A

Priority

AT 22899 U

Abstract (en)

The headlamp has a synthetic reflector, especially a thermoplastic reflector and an incandescent lamp holder board for inser an incandescent lamp. The lamp holder board (1) is mounted at a distance from the rear wall (2) of the reflector on bridges (3,4 made in one piece with and protruding from the rear wall of the reflector.

Abstract (de)

Vorgeschlagen wird ein Kfz-Scheinwerfer mit Kunststoffreflektor, insbesondere Thermoplastreflektor, und aufgesetzter Glühlampenhalterungsplatine (1) zum Einsetzen einer Glühlampe, mit dem Kennzeichen, daß die Glühlampenhalterungsplatine (1) auf von der Reflektorrückwand (2) abstehende, mit dieser einteilig ausgebildete Stege (3,4,5) mit Abstand zur Reflektorrückwand (2) aufgesetzt ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F21S 8/10; F21V 15/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21V 19/00 (2006.01); F21V 29/15 (2015.01); F21V 31/03 (2006.01); F21V 7/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21S 48/32 (2013.01); F21S 48/1118 (2013.01); F21S 48/1394 (2013.01); F21S 48/325 (2013.01); F21S 48/335 (2013.01); F21V 7/22 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1043544 A2 20001011; EP 1043544 A3 20011212; EP 1043544 B1 20070704; AT 3839 U1 20000825; DE 50014449 D1 20070816

INPADOC legal status

2015-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF THE APPLICANT RENOUNCES

- Effective date: 20141211

2014-12-11 [REG DE R231] PATENT ABANDONED FOR DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R231

- Ref Document Number: 50014449

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2014-08-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140409

- Year of fee payment: 15

2008-06-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20080407

2007-08-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50014449

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2007-08-16

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2007-07-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE

2006-09-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20060810

2002-09-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE

2002-08-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20020603

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI