Global Patent Index - EP 1043545 A2

EP 1043545 A2 2000-10-11 - Reflecting mirror manufacture method and lamp assembly

Title (en)

Reflecting mirror manufacture method and lamp assembly

Title (de)

Herstellungsverfahren eines Reflektors und Beleuchtungseinrichtung

Title (fr)

Méthode de fabrication d' un réflecteur et dispositif d' éclairage

Publication

EP 1043545 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00107500 A

Priority

JP 9862699 A

Abstract (en)

Light distribution characteristics are defined which define a correspondence relation between the position of a reflection point on a reference plane and the position of an image of a light source. In accordance with the light distribution characteristics, a path line in the reference plane is determined. A profile curve for each of a plurality of sampling points dispersibly distributed on the path line, is determined in accordance with the light distribution characteristics, the profile curve passing through the sampling point and corresponding to the topological shape of a reflecting surface to be determined. As the reflection point moves along the profile curve, the image of the light source moves in the direction crossing the reference plane in accordance with the light distribution characteristics. The topological shape of the reflecting surface is determined in accordance with the profile curve determined for each sampling point.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F21V 7/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G02B 5/10 (2006.01); B60Q 1/04 (2006.01); F21S 8/10 (2006.01); F21V 7/00 (2006.01); F21V 7/04 (2006.01); F21V 17/00 (2006.01); G02B 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21S 48/1376 (2013.01); F21V 7/04 (2013.01); F21W 2101/10 (2013.01); Y10S 359/90 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1043545 A2 20001011; EP 1043545 A3 20011128; JP 2000292611 A 20001020; JP 3424915 B2 20030707; KR 20010006960 A 20010126; US 6447148 B1 20020910

INPADOC legal status


2003-02-26 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020529

2002-09-19 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-08-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-11-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-11-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI