Global Patent Index - EP 1043547 A1

EP 1043547 A1 2000-10-11 - Device for evaluating the dirt condition of an oven cavity

Title (en)

Device for evaluating the dirt condition of an oven cavity

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Beurteilung des Schmutzzustandes von Backofenräumen

Title (fr)

Systéme d'évaluation de l'état de salissures de la cavité d'un four

Publication

EP 1043547 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00400611 A

Priority

FR 9903232 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2791127A1] System comprises a dirt cracking cell (1) that liberates cracking energy, thermometer (2) for measuring cell temperature and a heater (4) for intermittent heating of the cell (1) to a temperature sufficient to cause cracking of dirt specks so that the cracking energy raises the temperature measured such that processing means (5) can determine the level of dirt specks in the oven.

Abstract (fr)

L'invention concerne le domaine de la détection de salissures dans les cavités de four. C'est un système d'évaluation d'un état de salissures d'une cavité d'un four caractérisé en ce que le système comporte au moins une cellule (1) de craquage des salissures, le craquage dégageant une énergie (E) de craquage, des moyens (2) de mesure de température (T) associés à la cellule (1), des moyens (4) de chauffage intermittent de la cellule (1) à une température suffisante pour provoquer le craquage des salissures, l'énergie (E) de craquage influençant la température (T) mesurée, et des moyens (5) de traitement associant un niveau (N) de salissures à la température (T) mesurée. La détection de l'état de salissures d'une cavité de four permet d'optimiser la fréquence des pyrolyses. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24C 14/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24C 14/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24C 14/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

FR 2791127 A1 20000922; FR 2791127 B1 20010706; DE 60003252 D1 20030717; DE 60003252 T2 20040429; EP 1043547 A1 20001011; EP 1043547 B1 20030611; ES 2200792 T3 20040316

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 60003252

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160318

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-27 [REG FR GC] LIEN (PLEDGE) CONSTITUTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: GC

- Effective date: 20160426

2016-05-20 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: GROUPE BRANDT, FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

- Effective date: 20160420

2016-03-18 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-03-18 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: GROUPE BRANDT, FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 60003252

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2016-03-18 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 60003252

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: PRINZ & PARTNER MBB PATENTANWAELTE RECHTSANWAE, DE

2016-03-03 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: GROUPE BRANDT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PC2A

- Effective date: 20160226

2015-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150331

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150409

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150327

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-05-16 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: FAGORBRANDT SAS, FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 60003252

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20120322

2012-05-16 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: GROUPE BRANDT, FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 60003252

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20120322

2012-05-16 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 60003252

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: PRINZ & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE RECHTSANWAELTE, DE

- Effective date: 20120322

2012-05-16 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 60003252

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: PRINZ & PARTNER MBB PATENTANWAELTE RECHTSANWAE, DE

- Effective date: 20120322

2011-11-03 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: FAGORBRANDT SAS

- Ref Legal Event Code: PC2A

- Effective date: 20111021

2011-09-30 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: FAGORBRANDT SAS, FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

- Effective date: 20110826

2011-03-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100307

2011-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101001

2010-11-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20100307

2010-10-13 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: V1

- Effective date: 20101001

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090417

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-05-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090331

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-01-02 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

2008-01-02 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: BRANDT INDUSTRIES

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLS

- Effective date: 20071018

2007-12-16 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PC2A

2007-04-27 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2004-06-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040312

2004-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2200792

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2003-11-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20031017

2003-07-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 60003252

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-07-17

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL

2003-06-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-06-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR GB IT NL

2001-05-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010326

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL

2000-10-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI