Global Patent Index - EP 1043624 A1

EP 1043624 A1 2000-10-11 - Method of associating an information carrier to image carriers of a customer

Title (en)

Method of associating an information carrier to image carriers of a customer

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Zuordnung eines Informationsträgers zu Bildträgern eines Fotokunden

Title (fr)

Méthode pour l'association d'un support d'information à des supports d'image d'un client

Publication

EP 1043624 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99107002 A

Priority

EP 99107002 A

Abstract (en)

The method proposes that the coordination of the position of the information relative to the remainder of the print be based data stored in a computer

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren zur Zuordnung eines an den Kunden eines Fotohändlers gerichteten Informationsträgers zu einem auf Auftrag des Kunden erstellten Auftragsergebnis in Form von Papierfotoabzügen. Weiter betrifft die Erfindung einen entsprechenden Informationsträger und eine Anordnung der Bildträger und eines Informationsträgers oder mehrerer Informationsträger. Der vorliegenden Erfindung liegt die Aufgabe zugrunde, eine engere Zuordnung oder sogar Verflechtung der kundenspezifischen Bildträger mit wenigstens einem Informationsträger zu erzielen. Diese Aufgabe wird in Verfahrenshinsicht dadurch gelöst, daß auf dem Informationsträger die vorgesehene Information bzw. die diese Information bildenden Informationsdaten mit einem kundenspezifischen Bildbereich kombiniert wird, der aus einer für einen der Bildträger des Auftragsergebnisses vorgesehenen Bildinformation gewonnen und selektiert wurde.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03D 15/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03D 15/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03D 15/005 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1043624 A1 20001011

INPADOC legal status


2005-05-18 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20041110

2004-06-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040429

2001-06-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-06-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010411

2000-10-25 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CEWE COLOR AG & CO.OHG

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI