Global patent index - EP 1043631 A1

EP 1043631 A1 2000-10-11 - Method and system of fixing a preprint on thermal paper

Title (en)

Method and system of fixing a preprint on thermal paper

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM FIXIEREN EINES VORDRUCKES AUD THERMISCHEM PAPIER

Title (fr)

Procédé et système de fixation d'une préimpression sur papier thermique

Publication

EP 1043631 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00400732 A

Priority

FR 9904128 A

Abstract (en)

Thermal paper (1) is introduced in flash-oven (7, 8). Thermal waves are absorbed by ink, allowing ink to set. Method compris cooling of thermal layer (4) during fusion phase of ink so as to maintain temperature of thermal layer to temperature lower to toning temperature. Cooling of thermal layer starts when thermal wave touches thermal face (6) of paper. An Independent claim is also included for the apparatus used to apply fixing method.

Abstract (fr)

La présente invention concerne un procédé de fixation d'une préimpression sur papier thermique (1), consistant à refroidir la couche thermique (4) dudit papier thermique pendant la fusion de l'encre de manière à maintenir la température de ladite couche thermique à une valeur inférieure à la température de virage (T1). La présente invention concerne également le système de mise en oeuvre dudit procédé. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03G 15/20; B41M 5/26; G07B 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41M 5/26 (2006.01); B41M 7/00 (2006.01); G03G 15/20 (2006.01); B41M 3/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41M 5/26 (2013.01); B41M 7/009 (2013.01); G03G 15/2003 (2013.01); G03G 15/201 (2013.01); G03G 15/6591 (2013.01); G03G 2215/00523 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] US 5210580 A 19930511 - ASLAM MUHAMMAD [US], et al
  • [A] EP 0344789 A2 19891206 - TOSHIBA KK [JP]
  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 008, no. 157 (P - 288) 20 July 1984 (1984-07-20)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 013, no. 400 (M - 867) 6 September 1989 (1989-09-06)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1043631 A1 20001011; FR 2791784 A1 20001006; FR 2791784 B1 20020104

INPADOC legal status

2004-06-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20031123

2003-09-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NIPSON SAS

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-08-08 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2001-06-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY LI

2001-04-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010209

2001-03-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: XEIKON FRANCE SA

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-10-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI