Global patent index - EP 1043646 A2

EP 1043646 A2 2000-10-11 - Control device for controlling functions

Title (en)

Control device for controlling functions

Title (de)

Bedienteil für Steuerungsfunktionen

Title (fr)

Elément de contrôle pour des fonctions de commande

Publication

EP 1043646 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00104684 A

Priority

DE 19915990 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19915990C1] The operating part has several rotary knobs whose position is indicated by a light indicator containing a LED and optical conductor. One knob (2) has a light conducting body (4) interacting directly with the LED and with a light output surface that interacts with the input surface of a light conducting plate (7) leading to the other rotary knobs. The light conducting body has latching protrusions and recesses on the axial surfaces of its outer edge that interact with latching hooks on a clamp spring pushed between mounting ribs on the light conducting plate and held between a plate edge and a housing rib.

Abstract (de)

Das neue Bedienteil weist daher die Merkmale auf, daß der mit dem Drehknopf (2) verbundene Lichtleitkörper (4) auf Axialflächen (8,9) eines äußeren Randes (10) jeweils Verrastungsnoppen und -vertiefungen (11,12) aufweist, die mit Verrastungshaken (13) einer Klammerfeder (14) zusammenwirken, die innerhalb von Halterippen (15) auf die Lichtleitplatte (7) aufgeschoben und zwischen einer Lichtleitplattenkante (16) und einer Gehäuserippe (17) in Aufschieberichtung arretiert ist. Damit ist eine feinfühlige Verrastung und leichte Verstellbarkeit erreicht worden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G05G 1/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60K 37/06 (2006.01); B60H 1/00 (2006.01); G05G 1/08 (2006.01); H01H 19/02 (2006.01); H01H 19/11 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 19/025 (2013.01); H01H 19/11 (2013.01); H01H 2219/062 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 29501692 U1 19950406 - PREH ELEKTRO FEINMECHANIK [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19915990 C1 20000525; EP 1043646 A2 20001011; EP 1043646 A3 20010228; JP 2000322140 A 20001124; US 6392175 B1 20020521

INPADOC legal status

2006-12-06 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20060610

2004-06-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: PREH GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-11-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR GB IT

2001-03-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010118

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-02-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7G 05G 1/08 A, 7G 05G 1/10 B, 7B 60H 1/00 B

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-10-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI