Global Patent Index - EP 1043646 A3

EP 1043646 A3 2001-02-28 - Control device for controlling functions

Title (en)

Control device for controlling functions

Title (de)

Bedienteil für Steuerungsfunktionen

Title (fr)

Elément de contrôle pour des fonctions de commande

Publication

EP 1043646 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00104684 A

Priority

DE 19915990 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19915990C1] The operating part has several rotary knobs whose position is indicated by a light indicator containing a LED and optical conductor. One knob (2) has a light conducting body (4) interacting directly with the LED and with a light output surface that interacts with the input surface of a light conducting plate (7) leading to the other rotary knobs. The light conducting body has latching protrusions and recesses on the axial surfaces of its outer edge that interact with latching hooks on a clamp spring pushed between mounting ribs on the light conducting plate and held between a plate edge and a housing rib.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G05G 1/08; B60H 1/00; G05G 1/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60K 37/06 (2006.01); B60H 1/00 (2006.01); G05G 1/08 (2006.01); H01H 19/02 (2006.01); H01H 19/11 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 19/025 (2013.01); H01H 19/11 (2013.01); H01H 2219/062 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19915990 C1 20000525; EP 1043646 A2 20001011; EP 1043646 A3 20010228; JP 2000322140 A 20001124; US 6392175 B1 20020521

INPADOC legal status


2006-12-06 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060610

2004-06-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: PREH GMBH

2001-11-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

2001-03-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010118

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-02-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7G 05G 1/08 A, 7G 05G 1/10 B, 7B 60H 1/00 B

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-10-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI