Global Patent Index - EP 1043687 A1

EP 1043687 A1 2000-10-11 - Method for inserting a watermark and associated decoding method

Title (en)

Method for inserting a watermark and associated decoding method

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Einfügen eines Wasserzeichens und dazugehöriges Dekodierverfahren

Title (fr)

Méthode pour insérer un filigranne et méthode associée de décodage

Publication

EP 1043687 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00400949 A

Priority

  • FR 9904461 A
  • FR 9904462 A
  • FR 9908187 A

Abstract (en)

A method of determining a partition into distinct regions of a set of coefficients representative of at least a part of an image in order to insert a watermark comprises the following steps: generation (E501) of a centred pseudo-random sequence (w) equal in size to the cardinal number (N) of the said set of coefficients, formed from centred pseudo-random sub-sequences; modulation (E502) of the said set of coefficients by the said centred pseudo-random sequence (w) in order to insert the same information bit on the said set of coefficients; and checking (E504-E508), over each region, of a criterion of detectability of the information bit inserted by modulation. Use especially for determining an adaptative partition as a function of a criterion of detectability of an information bit inserted on each region. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06T 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 29/00 (2006.01); B41J 21/00 (2006.01); G06T 1/00 (2006.01); H04N 1/32 (2006.01); H04N 1/387 (2006.01); H04N 7/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06T 1/0028 (2013.01); H04N 1/32149 (2013.01); H04N 1/32165 (2013.01); H04N 1/3217 (2013.01); H04N 1/32192 (2013.01); H04N 1/32203 (2013.01); H04N 1/32229 (2013.01); G06T 2201/0052 (2013.01); G06T 2201/0065 (2013.01); H04N 2201/3233 (2013.01); H04N 2201/327 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] MENG AND CHANG: "EMBEDDING VISIBLE VIDEO WATERMARKS IN THE COMPRESSED DOMAIN", INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON IMAGE PROCESSING ICIP98, vol. 1, 4 October 1998 (1998-10-04) - 7 October 1998 (1998-10-07), NEW-YORK NY US, pages 474 - 477, XP002124674
  • [X] SWANSON E.A.: "OBJECT-BASED TRANSPARENT VIDEO WATERMARKING", IEEE FIRST WORKSHOP ON MULTIMEDIA SIGNAL PROCESSING, 23 June 1997 (1997-06-23) - 25 June 1997 (1997-06-25), NEW-YORK NY US, pages 369 - 374, XP002124675
  • [X] PODILCHUK C I ET AL: "IMAGE-ADAPTIVE WATERMARKING USING VISUAL MODELS", IEEE JOURNAL ON SELECTED AREAS IN COMMUNICATIONS,US,IEEE INC. NEW YORK, vol. 16, no. 4, 1 May 1998 (1998-05-01), pages 525 - 539, XP000765113, ISSN: 0733-8716
  • [X] TAO B ET AL: "ADAPTIVE WATERMARKING IN THE DCT DOMAIN", IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ACOUSTICS, SPEECH, AND SIGNAL PROCESSING (ICASSP),US,LOS ALAMITOS,CA: IEEE COMP. SOC. PRESS, 1997, pages 2985 - 2988, XP000788033, ISBN: 0-8186-7920-4
  • [X] RUANAIDH J J K O ET AL: "WATERMARKING DIGITAL IMAGES FOR COPYRIGHT PROTECTION", IEE PROCEEDINGS: VISION, IMAGE AND SIGNAL PROCESSING,GB,INSTITUTION OF ELECTRICAL ENGINEERS, vol. 143, no. 4, 1 August 1996 (1996-08-01), pages 250 - 256, XP000613938, ISSN: 1350-245X

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1043687 A1 20001011; EP 1043687 B1 20061122; DE 60031906 D1 20070104; DE 60031906 T2 20070426; JP 2000350014 A 20001215; JP 4208382 B2 20090114; US 7031491 B1 20060418

INPADOC legal status


2015-02-27 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140430

2015-01-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140406

2015-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141101

2015-01-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20141231

2015-01-22 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60031906

- Effective date: 20141101

2014-12-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140406

2014-11-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60031906

2013-08-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130517

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130418

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130430

- Year of fee payment: 14

2007-10-31 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070823

2007-04-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-01-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60031906 P 20070104

2006-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2006-11-22 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2006-04-26 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: METHOD FOR INSERTING A WATERMARK AND ASSOCIATED DECODING METHOD

2004-06-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040512

2001-06-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2001-04-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010223

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-10-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI