Global Patent Index - EP 1043709 A1

EP 1043709 A1 2000-10-11 - System for securing guitar strap

Title (en)

System for securing guitar strap

Title (de)

Verfahren zum sichern von einen halteband für Gitarren

Title (fr)

Système de sécurité de fixation de courroie de guitare

Publication

EP 1043709 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99400868 A

Priority

EP 99400868 A

Abstract (en)

The reinforcing plate for the end of a guitar strap (6) is fixed directly onto the strap and has two section (1) defining an opening (3). The plate is held in place by an elastic strap. The plate is hinged. The plate has a finger tab (5) allowing pressi downwardly.

Abstract (fr)

Dispositif de sécurité pour renforcer la fixation des courroies de guitare. l'invention concerne un dispositif de sécurité pour renforcé la fixation des courroies de guitare, ce dispositif intégré à la courroie de guitare s'adapte aux différents embouts. Il est constitué d'une part d'un ensemble (1) articulé présentant un orifice (3) d'une forme permettant l'adaptation aux différents embouts de guitare et d'autre part d'un système élastique (4) reliant l'ensemble (1) à la courroie de guitare (6) et permettant par sa tension la mise en place de l'ensemble (1) et par son relâchement le verrouillage de ce même ensemble (1) sur l'embout de guitare. Ce dispositif selon l'invention est particulièrement destiné aux renforcement de la fixation des courroies de guitare. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G10G 5/00; G10D 3/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G10D 3/18 (2006.01); G10G 5/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G10G 5/005 (2013.01); G10D 3/18 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1043709 A1 20001011

INPADOC legal status


2002-05-29 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-04-24 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010412

2001-06-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-06-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Owner name: MELIS, JEAN-PIERRE, PASCAL

2001-02-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MELIS, MONIQUE

2001-02-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MELIS, JEAN-PIERRE, PASCAL

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI