Global Patent Index - EP 1043747 A2

EP 1043747 A2 2000-10-11 - Sensor switch

Title (en)

Sensor switch

Title (de)

Sensortaster

Title (fr)

Commutateur-capteur

Publication

EP 1043747 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00810230 A

Priority

CH 65799 A

Abstract (en)

The sensor switch consists of a combination of a sensor system (3) with a mechanical-pressure sensitive system (7), whereby systems are complementary and are mounted in a housing (6) with a guide that acts a light diffusing body (8) when illuminated. I the sensor system is not activated because of a poorly conducting actuating material, activation is achieved by the actuation pressure on the mechanical-pressure sensitive system and the function of the sensor switch is guaranteed.

Abstract (de)

Durch die Kombination von Sensor-Systemen mit mechanischdruckempfindlichen oder verschleissfreien druck- bzw. lichtempflindlichen Systemen können optimale Lösungen für Sensortaster, nicht nur in vandalensicherer Ausführung, sondern auch in höheren Schutzklassen, erreicht werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 9/54

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 9/54 (2006.01); H01H 3/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 9/54 (2013.01); H01H 3/12 (2013.01); H01H 2003/0293 (2013.01); H01H 2009/0083 (2013.01); H01H 2219/0622 (2013.01); H01H 2239/038 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1043747 A2 20001011; EP 1043747 A3 20020904

INPADOC legal status


2007-03-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060926

2003-12-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: COMPANY FOR TECHNOLOGY TRANSFER AND PATENTS (SARK-

2003-07-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030613

2003-05-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030304

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-04-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: COMPANY FOR TECHNOLOGY TRANSFER AND PATENTS

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI