Global Patent Index - EP 1043757 A1

EP 1043757 A1 2000-10-11 - Gas discharge lamp

Title (en)

Gas discharge lamp

Title (de)

Gasentladungslampe

Title (fr)

Lampe à décharge gazeuse

Publication

EP 1043757 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00201148 A

Priority

DE 19915617 A

Abstract (en)

The lamp has at least one capacitive input coupling structure (2) consisting of a dielectric with dielectric saturation polarization and an effective surface area, whereby the product of the effective area and the saturation polarization is 10<->5 C. The product of the coercive field strength and effective thickness of the dielectric that forms the capacitive input structure less than 200 V.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung bezieht sich auf eine Gasentladungslampe mit wenigstens einer kapazitiven Einkoppelstruktur. Nachteilig für den Betrieb von bekannten Gasentladungslampen ist eine notwendige Treiberelektronik. Diese hat die Aufgabe, die Gasentladung der Lampe zu zünden und einen Ballast für den Betrieb der Lampe an einem Stromkreis (4) zu liefern, ohne den es schnell zu einer Zerstörung der Lampe kommt. Um eine Gasentladungslampe mit wenigstens einer kapazitiven Einkoppelstruktur zu schaffen, die verbesserte Betriebseigenschaften aufweist, wird vorgeschlagen, daß wenigstens ein Dielektrikum (2) mit einer dielektrischen Sättigungspolarisation P und mit einer wirksamen Oberfläche A zur Bildung der Einkoppelstruktur vorgesehen ist, wobei das Produkt aus P·A > 10<-5>C beträgt. Eine solche Lampe kann insbesondere ohne eine Schaltung mit einer Treiberelektronik am Stromnetz für Privathaushalte (z.B. 230V/50Hz) betrieben werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01J 65/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01J 65/00 (2006.01); H01J 65/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01J 65/046 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

[DA] US 2624858 A 19530106 - GREENLEE WILLIAM B

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1043757 A1 20001011; EP 1043757 B1 20051005; CN 1214442 C 20050810; CN 1274943 A 20001129; DE 19915617 A1 20001012; DE 50011273 D1 20051110; JP 2000311660 A 20001107; US 6465955 B1 20021015

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090328

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091123

2010-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090328

2010-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091001

2009-12-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20091130

2009-11-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090328

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080425

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080327

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080515

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-05-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080227

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-09-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060706

2006-06-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-12-07 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20051114

2005-11-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50011273 P 20051110

2005-10-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2005-10-05 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-01-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031125

2003-05-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: PHILIPS INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY & STANDARDS GMBH

2003-05-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V.

2002-10-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: PHILIPS CORPORATE INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY GMBH

2002-10-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V.

2001-06-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2001-06-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010411

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-10-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI