Global Patent Index - EP 1043804 A2

EP 1043804 A2 2000-10-11 - Grounding lug clamp

Title (en)

Grounding lug clamp

Title (de)

Erdungsbügel

Title (fr)

Etrier de mise à la masse

Publication

EP 1043804 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00302945 A

Priority

US 28904699 A

Abstract (en)

A grounding lug clamp (10) has a top (12) and bottom (14) with a passageway (22) therethrough to withstand extremely high currents for sustained periods of time. The lug clamp (10) is secured to the armor wrap of an armored cable to ground the cable without splitting the armor wrap. The lug clamp (10) has a post or screw (38) for connecting to ground. The top (12) and bottom (14) are secured around the cable with dowel pins (32), a hinge and pins, or a sleeve. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 4/66

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 4/66 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 4/66 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1043804 A2 20001011; EP 1043804 A3 20020213; BR 0001196 A 20001114; CA 2302132 A1 20001009

INPADOC legal status


2003-01-29 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20021101

2002-12-05 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-10-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-02-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-02-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI