Global Patent Index - EP 1043805 A2

EP 1043805 A2 2000-10-11 - Electrical connection terminal

Title (en)

Electrical connection terminal

Title (de)

Elektrische Verbindungs- oder Anschlussklemme

Title (fr)

Borne à connexion électrique

Publication

EP 1043805 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00104111 A

Priority

DE 19915355 A

Abstract (en)

The terminal has a housing (2) of electrically conducting material containing a conducting connecting arrangement (10) with associated cable insertion openings in the housing and clamping devices for the inserted cables. The housing contains at least o temp. sensitive element (15) with electrical connections (16) and mounted in a thermal transfer association with an external hou surface. An Independent claim is also included for an electrical device, e.g. transformer, with an electrical terminal.

Abstract (de)

Eine elektrische Verbindungs- oder Anschlußklemme (1) ist mit einem temperaturempfindlichen Element (15) ausgestattet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 9/24; H01R 13/713

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01F 27/40 (2006.01); H01R 9/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01F 27/402 (2013.01); H01R 9/2425 (2013.01); H01F 2027/406 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FI FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1043805 A2 20001011; EP 1043805 A3 20011212; EP 1043805 B1 20050824; AT 303005 T 20050915; DE 19915355 A1 20001026; ES 2244370 T3 20051216

INPADOC legal status


2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20151228

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160210

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-02-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150302

2015-12-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150228

2015-11-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20151030

2014-05-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20140225

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-05-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140219

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120229

2012-12-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 303005 T

- Effective date: 20120229

2012-10-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120229

2011-05-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20110214

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20110214

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-08-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060526

2006-04-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-12-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2244370 T3

2005-09-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50011004 P 20050929

2005-08-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FI FR IT

2005-02-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOSSLOH-SCHWABE DEUTSCHLAND GMBH

2004-09-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040810

2002-09-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE ES FI FR IT

2002-07-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020517

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-12-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 01R 9/24 A, 7H 01R 13/713 B, 7H 01F 27/40 B

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FI FR IT

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI