Global Patent Index - EP 1043805 A3

EP 1043805 A3 2001-12-12 - Electrical connection terminal

Title (en)

Electrical connection terminal

Title (de)

Elektrische Verbindungs- oder Anschlussklemme

Title (fr)

Borne à connexion électrique

Publication

EP 1043805 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00104111 A

Priority

DE 19915355 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1043805A2] The terminal has a housing (2) of electrically conducting material containing a conducting connecting arrangement (10) with associated cable insertion openings in the housing and clamping devices for the inserted cables. The housing contains at least o temp. sensitive element (15) with electrical connections (16) and mounted in a thermal transfer association with an external hou surface. An Independent claim is also included for an electrical device, e.g. transformer, with an electrical terminal.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 9/24; H01F 27/40; H01R 13/713

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01F 27/40 (2006.01); H01R 9/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01F 27/402 (2013.01); H01R 9/2425 (2013.01); H01F 2027/406 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1043805 A2 20001011; EP 1043805 A3 20011212; EP 1043805 B1 20050824; AT 303005 T 20050915; DE 19915355 A1 20001026; ES 2244370 T3 20051216

INPADOC legal status


2018-06-29 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20180629

2018-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170901

2017-09-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50011004

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20151228

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160210

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-02-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150302

2015-12-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150228

2015-11-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20151030

2014-05-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20140225

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-05-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140219

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120229

2012-12-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 303005 T

- Effective date: 20120229

2012-10-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120229

2011-05-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20110214

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20110214

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-08-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060526

2006-04-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-12-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2244370 T3

2005-09-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50011004 P 20050929

2005-08-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FI FR IT

2005-02-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOSSLOH-SCHWABE DEUTSCHLAND GMBH

2004-09-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040810

2002-09-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE ES FI FR IT

2002-07-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020517

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-12-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 01R 9/24 A, 7H 01R 13/713 B, 7H 01F 27/40 B

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FI FR IT

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI