Global Patent Index - EP 1043813 A1

EP 1043813 A1 2000-10-11 - Apparatus for inspecting and manufacturing wire harness

Title (en)

Apparatus for inspecting and manufacturing wire harness

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Inspektion und Herstellung von Kabelbäumen

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour l'inspection et pour la fabrication de faisceau de câbles

Publication

EP 1043813 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00105088 A

Priority

JP 9871699 A

Abstract (en)

An image obtained by picking a pressed portion up is subjected to a binary-coding process so that the terminal t in a metal and luster portion is expressed with "white" pixels and the other non-luster portion, such as the sheath of the electric wire a and the connector C, is expressed with "black" pixels. A window w1 is set which is in contact with the leading end position X realized when the electric wire a of the binary image is normally pressed. Another window w2 distant at a deep portion of a cavity s is set. When pressing is normally performed, the inside portion in the first window w1 completely correspond to the sheath of the electric wire a. Therefore, pixels a are completely "black" pixels. Since the electric wire a is not introduced into the second window w2, pixels are completely "black" pixels. A product deviated from the foregoing state is determined as a faulty product. Thus, the appearance inspection about the state of connection of the electric wire a can automatically be performed in a non-contact manner. As a result, reliable and efficient inspection can be performed. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 43/052

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H05K 13/08 (2006.01); H01R 43/048 (2006.01); H01R 43/052 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 43/048 (2013.01); H01R 43/052 (2013.01); H01R 2201/20 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1043813 A1 20001011; EP 1043813 B1 20030813; DE 60004426 D1 20030918; DE 60004426 T2 20040609; JP 2000295000 A 20001020

INPADOC legal status


2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060308

- Year of fee payment: 7

2008-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070402

2008-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070310

2008-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071002

2008-01-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20071130

2007-11-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070310

2006-03-08 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060308

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-03-02 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060302

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-08-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040514

2004-05-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-09-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60004426 P 20030918

2003-08-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-08-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-03-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: AUTONETWORKS TECHNOLOGIES, LTD.

2003-03-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SUMITOMO WIRING SYSTEMS, LTD.

2003-03-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES, LTD.

2002-01-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011121

2001-06-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2001-05-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010322

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-10-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI