Global patent index - EP 1043918 A1

EP 1043918 A1 2000-10-11 - Starting device with error detection

Title (en)

Starting device with error detection

Title (de)

Vorschaltgerät mit Fehlererkennung

Title (fr)

Starter pour lampe à décharge avec détection d'erreur

Publication

EP 1043918 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00101274 A

Priority

DE 19916080 A

Abstract (en)

The lamp has four pair-wise connected connections. The adapter has a first lamp branch (4) for supplying a first lamp with t main connections (8,11) for feeding and returning lamp current and two heater connections (9,12) for feeding and returning a hea current. A second lamp branch (5) for a second lamp has two main and two heating connections. A supply circuit feeds both branch each of which has an ignition capacitor (16,17) and a stabilizing capacitor (55,56).

Abstract (de)

Ein Vorschaltgerät (1) für Gasentladungslampen, insbesondere Leuchtstofflampen (2) weist zwei Lampenzweige (4, 5) auf, die durch einen Symmetriertransformator (27) miteinander gekoppelt sind. Insbesondere, um einen stabilen Dimmbetrieb zu ermöglichen, sind den Leuchtstofflampen (2, 3) Stabilisierungskondensatoren (55, 56) parallelgeschaltet. Außerdem ist der Symmetriertransformator (27) über eine Messwicklung (33) an eine Symmetrieüberwachungsschaltung (33a) angeschlossen, die bei Vorliegen einer Unsymmetrie, wie sie beispielsweise infolge des Auftretens eines Gleichrichtereffekts an einer der Leuchtstofflampen (2, 3) auftreten kann, ein entsprechendes Steuersignal an eine Steuerschaltung (23) gibt. Dies kann zum Stillsetzen des Vorschaltgeräts 1 genutzt werden. Eine weitere Verbesserung kann erreicht werden, indem zusätzlich kapazitive Koppelzweige (51, 52) zwischen den Lampenzweigen (4, 5) und der Symmetrieüberwachungsschaltung (33a) vorgesehen werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H05B 41/16; H05B 37/02; H05B 41/04; H05B 41/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H05B 41/282 (2006.01); H05B 41/298 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H05B 41/2985 (2013.01); H05B 41/2822 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [XA] US 3665243 A 19720523 - KANEDA ISAO, et al
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1999, no. 09 30 July 1999 (1999-07-30)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1999, no. 11 30 September 1999 (1999-09-30)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1043918 A1 20001011; DE 19916080 A1 20001026; DE 19916080 C2 20011122

INPADOC legal status

2002-09-11 [18R] REFUSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18R

- Effective date: 20020421

2001-06-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010228

2001-01-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001206

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI