Global patent index - EP 1043930 A1

EP 1043930 A1 2000-10-18 - METHOD FOR PREPARING SUBSTITUTED 4-PHENYL-4-CYANOCYCLOHEXANOIC ACIDS

Title (en)

METHOD FOR PREPARING SUBSTITUTED 4-PHENYL-4-CYANOCYCLOHEXANOIC ACIDS

Title (de)

METHODE ZUR DARSTELLUNG VON SUBSTITUIERTEN 4-PHENYL-4-CYANOCYCLOHEXANSÄUREN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE PREPARATION D'ACIDES 4-PHENYL-4-CYANOCYCLOHEXANOIQUES SUBSTITUES

Publication

EP 1043930 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98950965 A

Priority

  • US 9821061 W
  • US 6161397 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9918793A1] This invention relates to a method of preparing a compound type where at least one of R' or R'' is a carboxyl group (I) by treating a compound of formula (II) with a Group I(a) or Group II(a) metal halide, with an aprotic dipolar amide-based solvent and water.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A01N 43/38; A01N 37/34; A01N 43/20; A01N 43/24; C07C 45/71; C07C 47/575; C07C 255/46; C07D 303/48

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/275 (2006.01); A61P 11/06 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01); C07C 41/22 (2006.01); C07C 41/26 (2006.01); C07C 43/253 (2006.01); C07C 45/71 (2006.01); C07C 47/575 (2006.01); C07C 253/30 (2006.01); C07C 255/46 (2006.01); C07D 303/48 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07D 303/48 (2013.01); C07C 45/71 (2013.01); C07C 47/575 (2013.01); C07C 255/46 (2013.01); C07C 2101/08 (2013.01); C07C 2101/14 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

C07C 45/71 + C07C 47/575

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9918793 A1 19990422; AP 1335 A 20041129; AP 200001782 D0 20000630; AR 015952 A1 20010530; AU 741832 B2 20011213; AU 9687498 A 19990503; BG 104302 A 20010831; BR 9814064 A 20000926; CA 2305614 A1 19990422; CN 1192025 C 20050309; CN 1275052 A 20001129; DZ 2619 A1 20030308; EA 003609 B1 20030626; EP 1043930 A1 20001018; EP 1043930 A4 20040915; HU 0003905 A2 20010328; HU 0003905 A3 20020128; ID 25536 A 20001012; IL 135434 A 20041215; IL 135434 D0 20010520; JP 2001519363 A 20011023; MA 24670 A1 19990701; MY 122105 A 20060331; NO 20001777 A 20000503; NO 20001777 D0 20000406; NZ 503759 A 20020301; OA 11347 A 20031217; PE 121599 A1 20000219; PL 191974 B1 20060731; PL 339759 A1 20010102; SK 4902000 A3 20001107; TR 200000945 T2 20001023; TW 440557 B 20010616; UA 67753 C2 20001016; UY 25201 A1 20010827; UY 25524 A1 20000223; ZA 9809228 B 19990412

INPADOC legal status

2008-05-16 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Ref Legal Event Code: WD

- Ref Document Number: 1033538

- Country of Ref Document: HK

2007-07-25 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20061205

2006-08-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20060724

2004-09-15 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20040730

2004-09-15 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7A 01N 43/38 A

2004-09-15 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7A 01N 43/20 B

2004-09-15 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7A 01N 43/24 B

2004-09-15 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7A 01N 37/34 B

2004-09-15 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7C 07C 45/71 B

2004-09-15 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7C 07C 47/575 B

2004-09-15 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7C 07C 255/46 B

2004-09-15 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7C 07D 303/48 B

2001-05-30 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORPORATION

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-10-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000508

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: SI PAYMENT 20000508