Global Patent Index - EP 1043944 A1

EP 1043944 A1 2000-10-18 - PRESSURE-SENSITIVE ADHESIVE COATED LINERLESS NON-WOVEN LOOP

Title (en)

PRESSURE-SENSITIVE ADHESIVE COATED LINERLESS NON-WOVEN LOOP

Title (de)

MIT DRUCKEMPFINDLICHEM KLEBSTOFF BESCHICHTETES NICHT-GEWEBTES HAFTSCHLUSSSMATERIAL OHNE TRENNSCHICHT

Title (fr)

BANDE NON TISSEE A BOUCLES SANS SUPPORT RECOUVERTE D'UN ADHESIF SENSIBLE A LA PRESSION

Publication

EP 1043944 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98914227 A

Priority

  • US 9802957 W
  • US 96530597 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9923905A1] A storage/dispensing assembly, e.g., a roll or stack, of non-woven loop tape fastener material such as is used in hook and loop fastening system comprising one or more multilayer sheets of loop tape fastener material arranged such that the adhesive layer in the assembly of an overlying non-woven loop tape fastener material is in direct contact with the underlying loop layer of non-woven loop tape fastener material. The non-woven loop layer is formed at least in part of fibers having a denier of greater than 15 so as to decrease the level of fibers disengagement when an overlying loop tape fastener material is removed from the assembly.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A44B 18/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A44B 18/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A44B 18/0069 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9923905A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9923905 A1 19990520; AR 014390 A1 20010228; AU 6863198 A 19990531; BR 9814847 A 20001003; DE 69803410 D1 20020228; DE 69803410 T2 20021002; EP 1043944 A1 20001018; EP 1043944 B1 20020102; JP 2001522620 A 20011120; TW 425349 B 20010311

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090403

2010-05-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090430

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091222

2010-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091103

2010-01-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20091231

2009-10-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *MINNESOTA MINING AND MFG CY

- Effective date: 20090430

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080403

2008-12-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080403

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080417

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080428

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-09-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20080527

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080602

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-11-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070425

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-06-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2003-01-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-06-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2002-05-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-02-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69803410 20020228

2002-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT NL

2002-01-02 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020102

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-01-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001201

2000-10-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000526

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT NL