Global Patent Index - EP 1043945 A1

EP 1043945 A1 2000-10-18 - BRUSH DEVICE

Title (en)

BRUSH DEVICE

Title (de)

BÜRSTE

Title (fr)

BROSSE

Publication

EP 1043945 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98965354 A

Priority

  • SE 9802453 W
  • SE 9704892 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9933375A1] This invention concerns an ordinary brush such as a yard brush or similar that is complemented in such a way that it can simply and comfortably also be used to brush clean a shoe or other footwear, primarily on the underside. This is achieved by the bristle holder section of the brush, which is formed in a conventional way with a long flat surface (5) from which downwardly pointing bristles (2) extend out in clusters essentially at right angles from the surface of the bristle holder, also being provided with upwardly pointing bristles on the upper side.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A46B 17/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A46B 9/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A46B 9/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9933375A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE DK FI GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9933375 A1 19990708; AU 2082899 A 19990719; DE 69813891 D1 20030528; DE 69813891 T2 20040226; EP 1043945 A1 20001018; EP 1043945 B1 20030423; SE 511930 C2 19991220; SE 9704892 D0 19971229; SE 9704892 L 19990630

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160701

2016-07-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69813891

2015-07-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20150630

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150121

- Year of fee payment: 17

2004-08-18 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20031229

2004-04-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040126

2003-12-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031229

2003-07-23 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030723

2003-05-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69813891 P 20030528

2003-04-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK FI GB

2003-04-23 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-04-23 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030423

2002-07-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020606

2002-07-03 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: BROOM DEVICE

2002-06-26 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: BROOM DEVICE

2000-10-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000725

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK FI GB