Global Patent Index - EP 1043994 A4

EP 1043994 A4 2002-09-11 - METHOD FOR TREATING MULTIPLE SCLEROSIS

Title (en)

METHOD FOR TREATING MULTIPLE SCLEROSIS

Title (de)

THERAPIE DER MULTIPLEN SKLEROSE

Title (fr)

METHODE DE TRAITEMENT DE LA SCLEROSE EN PLAQUES

Publication

EP 1043994 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 99900751 A

Priority

  • US 9900126 W
  • US 7067698 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9934797A1] A method for treating multiple sclerosis comprising administering compounds of Formula (I) where X4 is a 1-substituted cyclohexyl group and the other groups are ethers or thioethers or a compound of Formula (II) where W is an aliphatic group of 2 to 6 carbons and R3 is an acid, amide or aromatic or heteroaromatic group and Z is exemplified by an alcohol or alcohol derivative.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 31/41; A61K 31/075; A61K 31/165; A61K 31/19; A61K 31/215; A61K 31/235; A61K 31/38; A61K 31/425; A61K 31/44; A61K 31/505

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07D 285/12 (2006.01); A61K 31/075 (2006.01); A61K 31/165 (2006.01); A61K 31/192 (2006.01); A61K 31/216 (2006.01); A61K 31/275 (2006.01); A61K 31/381 (2006.01); A61K 31/41 (2006.01); A61K 31/4245 (2006.01); A61K 31/426 (2006.01); A61K 31/433 (2006.01); A61K 31/4409 (2006.01); A61K 31/505 (2006.01); A61P 25/00 (2006.01); C07C 255/46 (2006.01); C07D 257/04 (2006.01); C07D 271/06 (2006.01); C07D 271/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/426 (2013.01); A61K 31/075 (2013.01); A61K 31/165 (2013.01); A61K 31/192 (2013.01); A61K 31/216 (2013.01); A61K 31/381 (2013.01); A61K 31/41 (2013.01); A61K 31/4245 (2013.01); A61K 31/433 (2013.01); A61K 31/4409 (2013.01); A61K 31/505 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [Y] WO 9619990 A1 19960704 - SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORP [US], et al
  • [Y] DATABASE MEDLINE [online] 1 August 1997 (1997-08-01), EKHOLM D ET AL: "Differential expression of cyclic nucleotide phosphodiesterase 3 and 4 activities in human T cell clones specific for myelin basic protein.", XP002205622, Database accession no. NLM9233651 & JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY (BALTIMORE, MD.: 1950) UNITED STATES 1 AUG 1997, vol. 159, no. 3, 1 August 1997 (1997-08-01), pages 1520 - 1529, ISSN: 0022-1767JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY (BALTIMORE, MD.: 1950) UNITED STATES 1 AUG 19971997080115930022-176715201529
  • [Y] DATABASE MEDLINE [online] October 1997 (1997-10-01), SOMMER N ET AL: "Therapeutic potential of phosphodiesterase type 4 inhibition in chronic autoimmune demyelinating disease.", XP002205623, Database accession no. NLM9357447 & JOURNAL OF NEUROIMMUNOLOGY. NETHERLANDS OCT 1997, vol. 79, no. 1, October 1997 (1997-10-01), pages 54 - 61, ISSN: 0165-5728JOURNAL OF NEUROIMMUNOLOGY. NETHERLANDS OCT 19971997107910165-57285461
  • See also references of WO 9934797A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9934797 A1 19990715; AU 2026299 A 19990726; CA 2317548 A1 19990715; EP 1043994 A1 20001018; EP 1043994 A4 20020911; JP 2002500187 A 20020108

INPADOC legal status


2003-04-02 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020801

2002-09-11 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20020729

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

2002-08-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 61K 31/41 A, 7A 61K 31/235 B, 7A 61K 31/165 B, 7A 61K 31/075 B, 7A 61K 31/19 B, 7A 61K 31/215 B, 7A 61K 31/38 B, 7A 61K 31/425 B, 7A 61K 31/44 B, 7A 61K 31/505 B

2000-10-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000731

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL