Global Patent Index - EP 1043995 B9

EP 1043995 B9 2007-10-31 - INHIBITION OF p38 KINASE ACTIVITY USING ARYL AND HETEROARYL SUBSTITUTED HETEROCYCLIC UREAS

Title (en)

INHIBITION OF p38 KINASE ACTIVITY USING ARYL AND HETEROARYL SUBSTITUTED HETEROCYCLIC UREAS

Title (de)

INHIBIERUNG DER p38 KINASE-AKTIVITÄT DURCH DIE VERWENDUNG VON ARYL- UND HETEROARYLSUBSTITUIERTEN HARNSTOFFEN

Title (fr)

INHIBITION DE L'ACTIVITE DE p38 KINASE AU MOYEN D'UREES HETEROCYCLIQUES ARYLE ET HETEROARYLE SUBSTITUEES

Publication

EP 1043995 B9 (EN)

Application

EP 98964708 A

Priority

  • US 9826079 W
  • US 99575197 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9932110A1] This invention relates to the use of a group of aryl ureas in treating cytokine mediated diseases other than cancer and proteolytic enzyme mediated diseases other than cancer, and pharmaceutical compositions for use in such therapy.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/38 (2006.01); C07D 333/36 (2006.01); A61K 31/00 (2006.01); A61K 31/381 (2006.01); A61K 31/415 (2006.01); A61K 31/44 (2006.01); A61K 31/4427 (2006.01); A61K 31/443 (2006.01); A61K 31/4436 (2006.01); A61P 1/04 (2006.01); A61P 9/02 (2006.01); A61P 11/06 (2006.01); A61P 19/02 (2006.01); A61P 19/10 (2006.01); A61P 29/00 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01); C07D 231/40 (2006.01); C07D 333/40 (2006.01); C07D 401/12 (2006.01); C07D 405/04 (2006.01); C07D 405/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/415 (2013.01); A61K 31/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL LT LV MK RO SI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9932110 A1 19990701; AT 346600 T 20061215; AU 1997099 A 19990712; AU 762077 B2 20030619; CA 2315647 A1 19990701; CA 2315647 C 20090929; CY 1107995 T1 20130904; DE 1043995 T1 20010607; DE 69836563 D1 20070111; DE 69836563 T2 20070516; DK 1043995 T3 20070305; EP 1043995 A1 20001018; EP 1043995 A4 20030507; EP 1043995 B1 20061129; EP 1043995 B9 20071031; EP 1043995 B9 20081008; ES 2155817 T1 20010601; ES 2155817 T3 20070616; GR 20010300018 T1 20010531; HK 1031832 A1 20081212; IL 136768 A 20061031; IL 136768 D0 20010614; JP 2001526222 A 20011218; PT 1043995 E 20070131

INPADOC legal status


2016-06-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131222

2015-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131231

2015-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131223

2015-03-30 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20150330

2015-01-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131231

2014-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131231

2014-11-28 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131222

2014-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131222

2014-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131231

2014-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140701

2014-10-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131231

2014-10-31 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140702

2014-10-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140701

2014-10-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131222

2014-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131231

2014-10-16 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69836563

- Effective date: 20140701

2014-09-30 [REG SI KO00] LAPSE OF PATENT

- Effective date: 20140805

2014-09-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140829

2014-09-24 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2014-09-04 [REG GR ML] LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Document: GR 20070400083

- Effective date: 20140702

2014-08-29 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131222

2014-08-29 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131222

2014-08-29 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140623

2014-08-29 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131222

2014-08-29 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131223

2014-08-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20131222

2014-08-25 [REG LT MM9D] CANCELLATION OF EXTENSION OF EUROPEAN PATENT

- Effective date: 20131222

2014-08-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 346600 T

- Effective date: 20131222

2014-07-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131231

2014-07-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2014-07-29 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2014-07-23 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140701

2014-07-21 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Effective date: 20131231

2014-07-01 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20140623

2014-07-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69836563

2014-06-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: BAYER HEALTHCARE LLC

- Effective date: 20131231

2013-05-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20121225

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-05-31 [PGFP CY] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Payment date: 20121219

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-04-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20121227

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20121226

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-04-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20130102

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20121231

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-03-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130110

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-03-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20121204

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20121227

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-02-28 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20121207

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-02-28 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20121228

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20121221

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-01-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20121231

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-01-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20121226

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-01-31 [PGFP MC] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Payment date: 20121203

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-01-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20121228

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-01-31 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20121231

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-01-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20121226

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-03-09 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER GRANTED

- Owner name: BAYER HEALTHCARE LLC

- Effective date: 20110225

2010-10-29 [REG SI SP73] CHANGE OF DATA ON OWNER

- Owner name: BAYER HEALTHCARE LLC; US

- Effective date: 20100923

2010-05-06 [REG NL SD] ASSIGNMENTS OF PATENTS

- Effective date: 20100423

2010-04-09 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2009-12-23 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20091126 AND 20091202

2009-12-18 [REG PT PC4A] TRANSFER OF ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: BAYER HEALTHCARE LLC, US

- Effective date: 20091120

2008-12-12 [REG HK GR] STANDARD PATENTS GRANTED IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1031832

2008-11-28 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071222

2008-06-25 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: BAYER PHARMACEUTICALS CORP.

- Free text: BAYER PHARMACEUTICALS CORP.#400 MORGAN LANE#WEST HAVEN, CT 06516 (US) -TRANSFER TO- BAYER PHARMACEUTICALS CORP.#400 MORGAN LANE#WEST HAVEN, CT 06516 (US)

2007-11-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070830

2007-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2155817 T3

2007-06-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-03-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: A. BRAUN, BRAUN, HERITIER, ESCHMANN AG PATENTANWAE

2007-03-20 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2007-03-05 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2007-02-15 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20070400083

2007-01-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20061228

2007-01-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69836563 P 20070111

2007-01-10 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2006-12-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2006-12-29 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2006-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2006-11-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2006-11-29 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2005-03-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BAYER PHARMACEUTICALS CORP.

2003-09-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030804

2003-05-07 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20030320

2003-05-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61K 31/38 A

2003-05-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61K 31/415 B

2003-05-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61K 31/44 B

2001-06-07 [DET] DE: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS

2001-06-01 [REG ES BA2A] PROVISIONAL PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2155817 T1

2001-05-15 [TCAT] AT: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS FILED

2001-05-15 [TCAT] AT: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS FILED

- Inventor name: KHIRE, UDAY

2001-05-15 [TCAT] AT: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS FILED

- Inventor name: LOWINGER, TIMOTHY, BRUNO

2001-05-15 [TCAT] AT: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS FILED

- Inventor name: RIEDL, BERND

2001-05-15 [TCAT] AT: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS FILED

- Inventor name: SCOTT, WILLIAM, J.

2001-05-15 [TCAT] AT: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS FILED

- Inventor name: SMITH, ROGER, A.

2001-05-15 [TCAT] AT: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS FILED

- Inventor name: WOOD, JILL, E.

2001-05-15 [TCAT] AT: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS FILED

- Inventor name: HATOUM-MOKDAD, HOLIA

2001-05-01 [TCNL] NL: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS FILED

2001-05-01 [TCNL] NL: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS FILED

- Inventor name: KHIRE, UDAY

2001-05-01 [TCNL] NL: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS FILED

- Inventor name: LOWINGER, TIMOTHY, BRUNO

2001-05-01 [TCNL] NL: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS FILED

- Inventor name: RIEDL, BERND

2001-05-01 [TCNL] NL: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS FILED

- Inventor name: SCOTT, WILLIAM, J.

2001-05-01 [TCNL] NL: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS FILED

- Inventor name: SMITH, ROGER, A.

2001-05-01 [TCNL] NL: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS FILED

- Inventor name: WOOD, JILL, E.

2001-05-01 [TCNL] NL: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS FILED

- Inventor name: HATOUM-MOKDAD, HOLIA

2001-04-27 [EL] FR: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED

2001-04-27 [EL] FR: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED

- Inventor name: KHIRE, UDAY

2001-04-27 [EL] FR: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED

- Inventor name: LOWINGER, TIMOTHY, BRUNO

2001-04-27 [EL] FR: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED

- Inventor name: RIEDL, BERND

2001-04-27 [EL] FR: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED

- Inventor name: SCOTT, WILLIAM, J.

2001-04-27 [EL] FR: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED

- Inventor name: SMITH, ROGER, A.

2001-04-27 [EL] FR: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED

- Inventor name: WOOD, JILL, E.

2001-04-27 [EL] FR: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED

- Inventor name: HATOUM-MOKDAD, HOLIA

2000-11-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: DUMAS, JACQUES

2000-11-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KHIRE, UDAY

2000-11-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: LOWINGER, TIMOTHY, BRUNO

2000-11-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: RIEDL, BERND

2000-11-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SCOTT, WILLIAM, J.

2000-11-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SMITH, ROGER, A.

2000-11-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: WOOD, JILL, E.

2000-11-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HATOUM-MOKDAD, HOLIA

2000-10-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000621

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 20000621;LT PAYMENT 20000621;LV PAYMENT 20000621;MK PAYMENT 20000621;RO PAYMENT 20000621;SI PAYMENT 20000621