Global Patent Index - EP 1044044 A1

EP 1044044 A1 2000-10-18 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR THE REMOVAL OF LIQUID FROM PARTICULATE MATERIAL

Title (en)

METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR THE REMOVAL OF LIQUID FROM PARTICULATE MATERIAL

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ENTFERNUNG VON FLÜSSIGKEIT AUS TEILCHENFÖRMIGEM MATERIAL

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET APPAREIL SERVANT A EXTRAIRE UN LIQUIDE D'UNE MATIERE PARTICULAIRE

Publication

EP 1044044 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99900207 A

Priority

  • DK 9900007 W
  • DK 1698 A
  • DK 62398 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9937374A1] Method and apparatus for the removal of liquid from particulate material by evaporation through the supply of heat, said heat being transferred substantially by superheated vapours or steam of the liquids existing in the particulate material, and where said method is executed in a substantially closed system. The particulate material is supplied continuously to a process chamber which is configured as an annular or partly annular chamber (1) which lies in a substantially horizontal manner, where the superheated vapours are introduced from below and up through openings (11) in a bottom (10) in the annular chamber, so that the particulate material is brought into movement by the superheated vapours, and such that a transport of the particulate material takes place through the annular chamber (1).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B01D 1/00; F26B 3/10; F26B 17/10; F26B 21/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F26B 3/10 (2006.01); B01D 1/00 (2006.01); F26B 3/092 (2006.01); F26B 17/10 (2006.01); F26B 21/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F26B 17/105 (2013.01); F26B 3/0926 (2013.01); F26B 17/107 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9937374A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9937374 A1 19990729; AT 390188 T 20080415; AU 1870199 A 19990809; CN 1141163 C 20040310; CN 1288394 A 20010321; CZ 20002520 A3 20001213; CZ 297514 B6 20070103; DE 69938417 D1 20080508; DE 69938417 T2 20090409; EP 1044044 A1 20001018; EP 1044044 B1 20080326; ES 2304804 T3 20081016; JP 2002501159 A 20020115; JP 3796404 B2 20060712; PL 193989 B1 20070430; PL 341671 A1 20010423; RU 2228496 C2 20040510; US 6154979 A 20001205

INPADOC legal status


2016-12-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-11-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160803

2016-10-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160107

2016-10-03 [REG GR ML] LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: ML

- Ref Document Number: 20080401538

- Country of Ref Document: GR

- Effective date: 20160803

2016-05-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160131

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160105

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160105

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160105

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160201

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160105

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160131

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160113

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160125

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-03-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160105

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-05 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-06-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20141222

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-04-30 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150119

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-01-30 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20141223

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-01-22 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: ASJ-IPR APS, DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 69938417

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20141211

2015-01-22 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 69938417

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: COHAUSZ & FLORACK PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE P, DE

- Effective date: 20141205

2015-01-22 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 69938417

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: COHAUSZ & FLORACK PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE P, DE

- Effective date: 20141211

2014-12-11 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 69938417

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: COHAUSZ & FLORACK PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE P, DE

2014-12-05 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 69938417

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: COHAUSZ & FLORACK PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE P, DE

2011-09-14 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R26

- Opponent name: BMA BRAUNSCHWEIGISCHE MASCHINENBAUANSTALT AG

- Effective date: 20081223

2010-03-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR1

- Opponent name: BRAUNSCHWEIGISCHE MASCHINENBAUANSTALT AG

2010-01-29 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090107

2009-12-30 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R26

- Opponent name: BRAUNSCHWEIGISCHE MASCHINENBAUANSTALT AG

- Effective date: 20081223

2009-04-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR1

- Opponent name: BRAUNSCHWEIGISCHE MASCHINENBAUANSTALT AG

2009-02-04 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: BRAUNSCHWEIGISCHE MASCHINENBAUANSTALT AG

- Effective date: 20081223

2009-01-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080326

2009-01-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2008-10-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2304804

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2008-07-16 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

- Ref Document Number: 20080401538

- Country of Ref Document: GR

2008-07-01 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2008-05-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: DR. LUSUARDI AG

2008-05-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69938417

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2008-05-08

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2008-04-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2008-04-30 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2008-03-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL SE

2008-03-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

LT LV RO

2008-03-26 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2007-05-02 [19F] DATE OF RESUMPTION (AFTER STAY OF PROCEEDINGS) BEFORE GRANT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 19F

- Effective date: 20070601

2002-05-22 [19A] DATE OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS BEFORE GRANT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 19A

- Effective date: 20020315

2000-10-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000809

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL SE

2000-10-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: LT PAYMENT 20000809;LV PAYMENT 20000809;RO PAYMENT 20000809