Global Patent Index - EP 1044050 A1

EP 1044050 A1 2000-10-18 - METHOD FOR FILTERING A LIQUID

Title (en)

METHOD FOR FILTERING A LIQUID

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR FILTRIERUNG EINER FLÜSSIGKEIT

Title (fr)

PROCEDE POUR LA FILTRATION D'UN LIQUIDE

Publication

EP 1044050 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98965744 A

Priority

  • DE 19753717 A
  • EP 9807846 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9929396A1] The invention relates to a method for filtering a liquid and to a device for carrying out said method whereby at least one container is provided from which a filter auxiliary agent is fed to a dosing device by a delivery device, and the filter auxiliary agent is supplied to an injecting container and/or to a filter element via the dosing device.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B01D 37/02; C10M 175/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01D 37/02 (2006.01); B01J 20/24 (2006.01); C10M 175/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B01J 20/24 (2013.01); B01D 37/02 (2013.01); C10M 175/0058 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9929396A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE ES FR GB GR SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9929396 A1 19990617; CA 2312794 A1 19990617; EP 1044050 A1 20001018; US 6555014 B1 20030429

INPADOC legal status


2010-02-03 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20090701

2008-08-06 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB GR SE

2003-12-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MANN + HUMMEL GMBH

2001-07-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010612

2000-10-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000522

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB GR IT SE