Global patent index - EP 1044073 A1

EP 1044073 A1 2000-10-18 - TRANSPARENT SUBSTRATE BEARING AN ANTI-STAIN, HYDROPHOBIC COATING, AND PROCESS FOR MAKING IT

Title (en)

TRANSPARENT SUBSTRATE BEARING AN ANTI-STAIN, HYDROPHOBIC COATING, AND PROCESS FOR MAKING IT

Title (de)

TRANSPARENTES SUBSTRAT MIT HYDROPHOBER ANTISCHMUTZBESCHICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZU DESSEN HERSTELLUNG

Title (fr)

SUBSTRAT TRANSPARENT PORTANT UNE COUCHE HYDROPHOBE ANTI-TACHE ET SON PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION

Publication

EP 1044073 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98953562 A

Priority

  • US 9821797 W
  • US 6234997 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9919084A1] A process is described for applying a thin-film, hydrophobic, oil-repellant, stain-resistant, optical coating to a transparent substrate. The coating is applied using a treatment solution that incorporates an organosilane in a solvent of water, alcohol, and ethylene glycol or glycerol, and an acid catalyst, with the organosilane having a preferred concentration in the range of 0.05 to 50 mmole per liter. The treatment solution preferably is prepared in a two-step procedure, in which the organosilane is first reacted in concentrated form and then diluted. After the treatment solution has been applied to the transparent substrate, e. g., by dip coating, the coated substrate is dried, preferably by flash-drying at room temperature and then heating it to a prescribed elevated temperature, in a prescribed humidity.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B05D 3/02; B05D 5/06; B32B 9/00; B32B 9/04; B32B 13/12; B32B 17/06; C03C 17/00; C03C 17/30; C03C 17/42; C08J 7/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05D 7/24 (2006.01); B05D 5/00 (2006.01); B32B 9/00 (2006.01); B32B 17/06 (2006.01); C03C 17/30 (2006.01); C09D 4/00 (2006.01); C09D 5/16 (2006.01); C09D 183/04 (2006.01); G02B 1/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G02B 1/10 (2013.01); C03C 17/30 (2013.01); C09D 4/00 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. C09D 4/00 + C08G 77/04
  2. C09D 4/00 + C08G 77/24

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9919084 A1 19990422; AU 1090199 A 19990503; AU 737281 B2 20010816; CA 2305513 A1 19990422; CA 2305513 C 20050104; EP 1044073 A1 20001018; EP 1044073 A4 20050413; JP 2003521360 A 20030715; JP 3579655 B2 20041020

INPADOC legal status

2012-01-04 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20110708

2007-05-30 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: YAZAKI CORPORATION

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2005-04-13 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20050301

2005-04-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7B 05D 3/02 A

2005-04-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7B 05D 5/06 B

2005-04-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7B 32B 9/00 B

2005-04-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7B 32B 9/04 B

2005-04-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7B 32B 13/12 B

2005-04-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7B 32B 17/06 B

2005-04-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7C 03C 17/30 B

2005-04-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7C 08J 7/04 B

2005-04-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7C 03C 17/42 B

2005-04-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7C 03C 17/00 B

2004-12-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7B 05D 3/02 A

2004-12-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7B 05D 5/06 B

2004-12-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7B 32B 9/00 B

2004-12-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7B 32B 9/04 B

2004-12-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7B 32B 13/12 B

2004-12-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7B 32B 17/06 B

2004-12-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7C 03C 17/30 B

2004-12-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7C 08J 7/04 B

2000-10-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000512

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI NL