Global Patent Index - EP 1044083 A1

EP 1044083 A1 2000-10-18 - DEVICE FOR DETACHABLY FIXING OBJECTS

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR DETACHABLY FIXING OBJECTS

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUM LÖSBAREN FESTLEGEN VON GEGENSTÄNDEN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF POUR LA FIXATION AMOVIBLE D'OBJETS

Publication

EP 1044083 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98943733 A

Priority

  • DE 29712619 U
  • DE 19822972 A
  • EP 9804419 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9903648A1] The invention relates to a device for accommodating objects, in particular receptacles (12 to 12.11) in which tools or tool parts are sorted and kept, on a bottom part (8) in particular of a drawer. A support (9) is fitted between the object (12 to 12.5, 12.9) and the bottom part (8). Said support has elements (11) for fixing the object (12).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B25H 3/02; B25H 3/06; A47B 88/20; B65D 25/10; B65D 21/02; B25H 3/00; B26B 29/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47B 88/20 (2006.01); B25H 3/00 (2006.01); B25H 3/02 (2006.01); B25H 3/06 (2006.01); B65D 25/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25H 3/003 (2013.01); A47B 88/90 (2017.01); B25H 3/02 (2013.01); B25H 3/028 (2013.01); B25H 3/06 (2013.01); B65D 25/10 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9903648 A1 19990128; AT 283149 T 20041215; EP 1044083 A1 20001018; EP 1044083 B1 20041124; US 6634728 B1 20031021

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160722

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160721

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160721

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160722

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130731

2014-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130731

2014-02-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2013-06-28 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120717

2013-03-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 283149 T

- Effective date: 20120717

2012-12-21 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: ROSE PLASTIC AG, DE

- Effective date: 20121121

2012-11-21 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20121025 AND 20121031

2012-06-06 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: ROSE PLASTIC AG, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: LEGUIN, HERMANN, 88279 AMTZELL, DE

- Document: DE 59812310

- Effective date: 20120417

2012-06-06 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59812310

- Representative's name: RIEBLING, PETER, DIPL.-ING. DR.-ING., DE

- Effective date: 20120213

2012-06-06 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59812310

- Representative's name: RIEBLING, PETER, DIPL.-ING. DR.-ING., DE

- Effective date: 20120417

2012-04-17 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59812310

- Representative's name: PETER RIEBLING, DE

2012-02-13 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59812310

- Representative's name: PETER RIEBLING, DE

2011-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20110714

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20110725

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050424

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *LEGUIN HERMANN

- Effective date: 20050731

2005-12-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-11-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050825

2005-08-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ARIE WUBBEN

2005-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050731

2005-07-17 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050717

2005-06-29 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2005-05-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2005-04-13 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050318

2005-03-06 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050306

2005-02-24 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050224

2005-02-24 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050224

2004-12-30 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-12-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59812310 P 20041230

2004-11-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-11-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL PT SE

2004-11-24 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-11-24 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041124

2004-03-24 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL PT SE

2003-04-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030228

2000-10-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000201

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE