Global Patent Index - EP 1044085 A1

EP 1044085 A1 2000-10-18 - CUTTING DEVICE FOR A PLASTIC SEAL

Title (en)

CUTTING DEVICE FOR A PLASTIC SEAL

Title (de)

SCHNEIDVORRICHTUNG FÜR EINEN KUNSTSTOFFVERSCHLU

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE COUPE POUR SYSTEME DE FERMETURE EN PLASTIQUE

Publication

EP 1044085 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98965871 A

Priority

  • DE 19758040 A
  • EP 9808438 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19758040A1] The invention relates to a device for making a cut in the peripheral direction of a plastic seal, comprising at least one blade, said blade being held by a holding device, and a fixing device for the seal. The invention is characterised in that the holding device (11) can be moved in relation to a path of motion (7) of the seal (3) by means of a control mechanism (29), in that the seal (3) is arranged in such a way that it can turn around its middle axis (5), and in that the cut is made by turning the seal (3) around its middle axis (5), the distance between the seal (3) and the blade (15) remaining constant or essentially constant whilst the seal is being turned.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B26D 3/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B26D 3/00 (2006.01); B26D 1/58 (2006.01); B26D 3/08 (2006.01); B26D 5/16 (2006.01); B26D 7/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B26D 7/2628 (2013.01); B26D 1/58 (2013.01); B26D 3/08 (2013.01); B26D 5/16 (2013.01); B26F 2210/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9933618A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19758040 A1 19990708; DE 19758040 C2 20010823; CA 2316815 A1 19990708; CA 2316815 C 20050614; CZ 20002414 A3 20010314; CZ 293237 B6 20040317; EA 001669 B1 20010625; EP 1044085 A1 20001018; EP 1044085 B1 20020327; ES 2173665 T3 20021016; HU 0100047 A2 20010528; HU 0100047 A3 20010628; HU 222222 B1 20030528; JP 2001526971 A 20011225; PL 188265 B1 20050131; PL 341385 A1 20010409; WO 9933618 A1 19990708

INPADOC legal status


2007-03-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20051224

2006-11-17 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20060831

2006-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060831

2006-08-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20051223

2006-08-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2006-07-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060701

2005-12-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051231

2005-12-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051231

2005-12-24 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051224

2005-12-23 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051223

2005-12-23 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051223

2004-12-09 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20041209

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-11-17 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20041117

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-11-16 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20041116

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-11-11 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20041111

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-10-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20041030

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-03-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20021230

2002-10-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2173665

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2002-09-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-07-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20020614

2002-05-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: TROESCH SCHEIDEGGER WERNER AG

2002-05-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59803573

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-05-02

2002-03-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2002-03-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-07-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010516

2000-10-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000731

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI