Global Patent Index - EP 1044086 B1

EP 1044086 B1 2003-06-25 - CUTTING DEVICE WITH DETACHABLE CUTTER HEAD FOR CUTTING SHEET MATERIAL LENGTH-WISE

Title (en)

CUTTING DEVICE WITH DETACHABLE CUTTER HEAD FOR CUTTING SHEET MATERIAL LENGTH-WISE

Title (de)

SCHNEIDEINRICHTUNG ZUM LANGSTEILEN VON MATERIALBAHNEN MIT LOSBAREM MESSERKOPF

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE COUPE A TETE DE COUPE AMOVIBLE POUR DECOUPER LONGITUDINALEMENT DES BANDES DE MATERIAU

Publication

EP 1044086 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 99955877 A

Priority

  • DE 19850043 A
  • EP 9908045 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19850043A1] The invention relates to a device for cutting sheet material length-wise. Said device comprises a knife holder (2) which can be linked to a cutter bar (1). Said knife holder substantially consists of a support body (3) and a cutter head (4) which is provided with a circular cutting knife (5) and which can be adjusted vertically and horizontally in relation to the support body (3). Said knife holder is also provided with a connector (12) for connecting the support body (3) to the cutter head (4) and/or the cutter bar (1). The direction of connection extends in the plane of the circular cutting knife (5).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B26D 7/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B26D 7/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B26D 7/2621 (2013.01); Y10T 83/7747 (2015.04); Y10T 83/7847 (2015.04); Y10T 83/9464 (2015.04)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19850043 A1 20000504; EP 1044086 A1 20001018; EP 1044086 B1 20030625; US 6474208 B1 20021105; WO 0025994 A1 20000511

INPADOC legal status


2008-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080501

2006-10-25 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20061025

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-07-09 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2004-06-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040326

2004-02-25 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2003-12-24 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20030625

2003-07-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59906094 P 20030731

2003-07-23 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-06-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-06-25 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030625

2003-06-25 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030625

2003-06-25 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030625

2002-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020315

2000-10-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000527

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE