Global Patent Index - EP 1044098 A1

EP 1044098 A1 2000-10-18 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR ACHIEVING ADHESION BETWEEN LAYERS OF TISSUE PAPER

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR ACHIEVING ADHESION BETWEEN LAYERS OF TISSUE PAPER

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM ERZEUGEN EINER LAGENHAFTUNG ZWISCHEN LAGEN AUS TISSUE-PAPIER

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR PRODUIRE UNE ADHERENCE ENTRE DES COUCHES DE PAPIER DE SOIE

Publication

EP 1044098 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98965792 A

Priority

  • DE 19758069 A
  • EP 9807994 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9933646A1] The invention relates to a method and a device for achieving adhesion between layers of tissue paper, according to which a surface structure corresponding to that of sandpaper is pressed into the product along the side of at least one roller when the individual layers are joined in a roll nip. This results in good adhesion between layers with only minor optical impairment of the product surface and without the use of glue or such like.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B31F 1/07

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B31F 1/07 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B31F 1/07 (2013.01); B31F 2201/0733 (2013.01); B31F 2201/0761 (2013.01); B31F 2201/0789 (2013.01); Y10S 493/96 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49936 (2013.01); Y10T 156/1023 (2013.01); Y10T 428/24463 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9933646A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DK ES FI FR GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9933646 A1 19990708; AR 017966 A1 20011024; AT 216653 T 20020515; AU 2159699 A 19990719; AU 758737 B2 20030327; BR 9814557 A 20001017; CO 5040092 A1 20010529; DE 19758069 C1 19991104; EP 1044098 A1 20001018; EP 1044098 B1 20020424; ES 2177130 T3 20021201; HU 0100281 A2 20010528; HU 0100281 A3 20010628; KR 20010033784 A 20010425; PE 65899 A1 19990803; PL 341407 A1 20010409; TW 500058 U 20020821; US 6454693 B1 20020924

INPADOC legal status


2005-12-09 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051209

2005-10-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050831

2005-08-02 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2005-07-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20041209

2005-03-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20031210

2004-12-10 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041210

2004-12-09 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041209

2004-12-04 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041204

2004-09-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040701

2004-07-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040701

2004-02-04 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040204

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-12-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20031230

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-12-24 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20031224

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-12-17 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20031217

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-12-10 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031210

2003-04-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030127

2002-12-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20021231

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-12-16 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20021216

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-12-09 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021209

2002-12-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2177130 T3

2002-10-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-07-24 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020724

2002-06-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020516

2002-04-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DK ES FI FR GB IT NL SE

2002-04-24 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-04-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 216653 T 20020515

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-10-31 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT DK ES FI FR GB IT NL SE

2001-06-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010426

2000-10-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000629

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DK ES FI FR GB IT NL SE