Global Patent Index - EP 1044107 A1

EP 1044107 A1 2000-10-18 - DEVICES FOR DRIVING A GUIDE ROLLER

Title (en)

DEVICES FOR DRIVING A GUIDE ROLLER

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNGEN ZUM ANTRIEB EINER LEITWALZE

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIFS POUR L'ENTRAINEMENT D'UN ROULEAU-GUIDE

Publication

EP 1044107 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98966783 A

Priority

  • DE 9803723 W
  • DE 19757979 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19758535A1] The invention relates to a device for driving a guide roller, wherein the guide roller is accelerated to a paper feed speed before the beginning of a paper strip reaches said device. According to the invention, this is achieved in that the drive mechanism of the guide roller is moved by a coupling of a driven draw-in mechanism in a draw-in system for paper and continuos products.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 13/03; B65H 20/00; B65H 27/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 13/00 (2006.01); B41F 13/03 (2006.01); B65H 20/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 13/03 (2013.01); B41P 2213/25 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9933661A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19758535 A1 19990701; EP 1044107 A1 20001018; EP 1044107 B1 20020515; JP 2001526989 A 20011225; JP 3353002 B2 20021203; US 6328195 B1 20011211; WO 9933661 A1 19990708

INPADOC legal status


2008-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080701

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20051122

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061218

2007-08-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20061218

2006-12-04 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20061204

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-11-17 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060831

2006-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060831

2006-08-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-12-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051231

2005-12-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051231

2005-12-18 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051218

2005-11-22 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20051122

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-12-17 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20041217

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-12-15 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20041215

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-05-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030218

2002-10-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-06-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59804158 20020620

2002-06-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020516

2002-05-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2002-05-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-05-15 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-01-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011210

2002-01-23 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-12-27 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000720

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI