Global Patent Index - EP 1044108 A1

EP 1044108 A1 2000-10-18 - DEVICE FOR DRAWING IN A WEB OF ENDLESS FABRIC

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR DRAWING IN A WEB OF ENDLESS FABRIC

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUM EINZIEHEN EINER WARENBAHN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF POUR L'ENTRAINEMENT D'UNE FEUILLE CONTINUE

Publication

EP 1044108 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98966785 A

Priority

  • DE 9803725 W
  • DE 19757978 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19757978A1] The invention relates to a device for drawing in a web of endless fabric using moving traction means along the path of the web of endless fabric. The web guide rollers in said device are accelerated before the arrival of the beginning of the web.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 13/03

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 13/02 (2006.01); B41F 13/03 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 13/03 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9933662A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19757978 A1 19990708; EP 1044108 A1 20001018; EP 1044108 B1 20011128; JP 2001526990 A 20011225; JP 3308971 B2 20020729; US 6321967 B1 20011127; WO 9933662 A1 19990708

INPADOC legal status


2008-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080701

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061218

2007-08-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20061218

2006-12-04 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20061204

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-11-17 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060831

2006-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060831

2006-08-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-12-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051231

2005-12-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051231

2005-12-18 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051218

2005-11-22 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20051122

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-12-17 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20041217

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-12-15 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20041215

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-11-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-07-24 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2002-05-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-01-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59802275 20020110

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-28 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2001-12-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20011128

2001-11-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-11-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2001-11-28 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2001-07-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010608

2000-10-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000720

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI