Global Patent Index - EP 1044110 A1

EP 1044110 A1 2000-10-18 - ARRANGEMENT FOR THE INKER UNIT OF A ROTARY PRESS

Title (en)

ARRANGEMENT FOR THE INKER UNIT OF A ROTARY PRESS

Title (de)

ANORDNUNG FÜR EIN FARBWERK EINER ROTATIONSDRUCKMASCHINE

Title (fr)

SYSTEME POUR UN DISPOSITIF D'ENCRAGE DE PRESSE ROTATIVE

Publication

EP 1044110 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98966798 A

Priority

  • DE 9803758 W
  • DE 19757897 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19757897C1] A roller in the inker unit of a rotary press has a structured surface and an adjacent doctor blade.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 31/02; B41F 31/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 31/08 (2006.01); B41F 31/02 (2006.01); B41F 31/20 (2006.01); B41F 31/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 31/027 (2013.01); B41F 31/26 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9933666A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19757897 C1 19990722; CN 1180938 C 20041222; CN 1284028 A 20010214; EP 1044110 A1 20001018; EP 1044110 B1 20030903; JP 2001526993 A 20011225; JP 3318325 B2 20020826; US 6439116 B1 20020827; WO 9933666 A1 19990708

INPADOC legal status


2011-05-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091222

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091221

2010-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091221

2010-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100701

2010-10-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091231

2010-10-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091231

2010-10-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091231

2010-09-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100831

2010-08-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20091221

2010-07-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2010-07-27 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20081217

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20081212

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20081211

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20081220

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-03-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20081217

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-01-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20081223

- Year of fee payment: 11

2004-08-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040604

2004-04-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-11-26 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031105

2003-11-18 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-10-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59809517 P 20031009

2003-09-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-09-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

2003-09-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2000-12-27 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

2000-10-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000720

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI SE