Global Patent Index - EP 1044128 A1

EP 1044128 A1 2000-10-18 - VALVE ARRANGEMENT FOR POWER-ASSISTED STEERING SYSTEMS

Title (en)

VALVE ARRANGEMENT FOR POWER-ASSISTED STEERING SYSTEMS

Title (de)

VENTILANORDNUNG FÜR SERVOLENKUNGEN

Title (fr)

ENSEMBLE SOUPAPE POUR DIRECTION ASSISTEE

Publication

EP 1044128 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99958008 A

Priority

  • DE 19852061 A
  • EP 9908543 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19852061A1] The invention relates to a hydraulically assisted steering system for a motor vehicle. An electromagnetic valve (12) is associated with a hydraulic system and directly or indirectly connects the working areas (3,4) when said valve is in an open position. This dispenses with conventional mechanical pressure limiting valves, feed valves and end stop valves.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B62D 5/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B62D 5/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B62D 5/061 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0027686A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19852061 A1 20000518; BR 9907235 A 20001017; EP 1044128 A1 20001018; US 6345682 B1 20020212; WO 0027686 A1 20000518

INPADOC legal status


2004-05-19 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT SE

2003-08-13 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030130

2002-11-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020919

2001-01-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001120

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE