Global Patent Index - EP 1044146 A1

EP 1044146 A1 2000-10-18 - DEVICE FOR EMPTYING REFUSE CONTAINERS

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR EMPTYING REFUSE CONTAINERS

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUM ENTLEEREN VON MÜLLBEHÄLTERN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT DE VIDER DES POUBELLES

Publication

EP 1044146 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98961170 A

Priority

  • DE 19753587 A
  • EP 9807180 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9928216A1] The invention relates to a device for emptying refuse containers into a collecting bin (3), comprising a lifting device (5) with a carriage unit (6) and at least one swivel device (20) mounted on the lifting device, on which a receiving device (10) grasps the refuse container. A four-bar guide (30a,b) arranged on the swivel arm (40a,b) and provided with an upper guide rod (31a,b) and a lower guide rod (32a,b) supports the lifting frame (11) with the receiving device (10). The upper guide rod (31a,b) extends beyond its pivot point (34a,b) as far as the collecting bin (3) and forms an actuating lever (33a,b), whereby a cylinder piston device (21) pivots between the free ends thereof and the carriage unit (6). When the cylinder piston device (21) is actuated, its pivot point (25) on the four-bar guide (30a,b) moves along the arc of a circle (25) between both pivot points (34a,b,37a,b) on the four-bar guide (30) on the swivel arm. This improves the limited ground clearance of vertically conveying lifters and increases height capacity for receiving containers onto the inventive device. The cylindrical piston device is substantially protected against damage.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65F 3/08; B65F 3/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65F 3/04 (2006.01); B65F 3/08 (2006.01); B65F 3/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65F 3/045 (2013.01); B65F 3/08 (2013.01); B65F 2003/0236 (2013.01); B65F 2003/024 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9928216A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9928216 A1 19990610; AT 211998 T 20020215; AU 1668399 A 19990616; AU 745640 B2 20020328; CZ 20001637 A3 20011212; CZ 291937 B6 20030618; DE 19753587 C1 19990722; DK 1044146 T3 20020506; EP 1044146 A1 20001018; EP 1044146 B1 20020116; ES 2172254 T3 20020916; HR P20000365 A2 20011231; HR P20000365 B1 20031031; HU 0100009 A2 20020729; HU 223832 B1 20050228; PL 193880 B1 20070330; PL 340721 A1 20010226; PT 1044146 E 20020731; RU 2197419 C2 20030127; SK 6552000 A3 20001009; TR 200001517 T2 20000921; YU 23900 A 20020619; YU 49063 B 20030829; ZA 9810355 B 19990519

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20161124

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-02-28 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20161122

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-02-28 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20161107

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-02-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20161124

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-02-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20161122

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-02-28 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20161124

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20161124

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20161124

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20161124

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20161124

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161125

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-31 [PGFP CY] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Payment date: 20161031

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20161124

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-31 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20161125

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20161124

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20161124

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-31 [PGFP MC] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Payment date: 20161129

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20161123

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-11-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-11-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2012-01-21 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59802678

- Representative's name: MEHLER ACHLER PATENTANWAELTE, DE

2012-01-21 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59802678

- Representative's name: MEHLER ACHLER PATENTANWAELTE PARTNERSCHAFT MBB, DE

2005-01-10 [REG SI IF] VALID ON THE PRS DATE

2003-01-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-09-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2172254 T3

2002-07-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20020411

2002-07-12 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-05-24 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20020400294

2002-05-06 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2002-05-01 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020410

2002-04-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: R. A. EGLI & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2002-02-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59802678 20020221

2002-02-20 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2002-01-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-01-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 20000428

2002-01-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 211998 T 20020215

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-01-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001205

2000-10-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000428

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 20000428